Mulligan et al v. 754-768 Brady Owners Corp. et al
Plaintiff: James Oehler and Christina Mulligan
Defendant: EBMG, LLC, 754-768 Brady Owners Corp. and Monique Bowe
Case Number: 1:2020cv07178
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 754-768 Brady Owners Corp., EBMG, LLC..(Mazzola, Bryan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 754-768 Brady Owners Corp., EBMG, LLC..(Mazzola, Bryan)
October 22, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Monique Bowe served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Christina Mulligan(individually ); Christina Mulligan(on behalf of minor daughter, N.O.); James Oehler (individually ); James Oehler(on behalf of minor daughter, N.O.)..(Frick, Alison)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. 754-768 Brady Owners Corp. answer due 10/30/2020; Monique Bowe answer due 10/30/2020; EBMG, LLC answer due 10/30/2020. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/25/2020) (mro)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Juan C. Gonzalez on behalf of 754-768 Brady Owners Corp...(Gonzalez, Juan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Bryan Mazzola dated 9/24/2020. Document filed by 754-768 Brady Owners Corp., EBMG, LLC..(Mazzola, Bryan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan J. Mazzola on behalf of 754-768 Brady Owners Corp., EBMG, LLC..(Mazzola, Bryan)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monique Bowe..(dnh)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Monique Bowe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christina Mulligan(individually ), Christina Mulligan(on behalf of minor daughter, N.O.), James Oehler(on behalf of minor daughter, N.O.), James Oehler (individually )..(Frick, Alison)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 754-768 Brady Owners Corp. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. Service was accepted by Shivani Jacobson, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Christina Mulligan(individually ); Christina Mulligan(on behalf of minor daughter, N.O.); James Oehler (individually ); James Oehler(on behalf of minor daughter, N.O.)..(Frick, Alison)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. EBMG, LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. Service was accepted by Shivani Jacobson, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Christina Mulligan(individually ); Christina Mulligan(on behalf of minor daughter, N.O.); James Oehler (individually ); James Oehler(on behalf of minor daughter, N.O.)..(Frick, Alison)
September 3, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Christina Mulligan, James Oehler added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Christina Mulligan, James Oehler. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Frick, Alison)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Frick, Alison)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monique Bowe..(dnh)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to EBMG, LLC..(dnh)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 754-768 Brady Owners Corp...(dnh)
September 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
September 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
September 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alison Ellis Frick. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christina Mulligan, James Oehler. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
September 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alison Ellis Frick re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add each of the plaintiffs a second time with party text 'on behalf of their minor daughter N.O.' Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (dnh)
September 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Alison Ellis Frick to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; The Courthouse Assignment was not designated on the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monique Bowe, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christina Mulligan, James Oehler..(Frick, Alison)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EBMG, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christina Mulligan, James Oehler..(Frick, Alison)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 754-768 Brady Owners Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christina Mulligan, James Oehler..(Frick, Alison)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Frick, Alison) Modified on 9/3/2020 (dnh).
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against 754-768 Brady Owners Corp., Monique Bowe, EBMG, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21462423)Document filed by Christina Mulligan, James Oehler..(Frick, Alison) Modified on 9/3/2020 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulligan et al v. 754-768 Brady Owners Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBMG, LLC
Represented By: Bryan J. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 754-768 Brady Owners Corp.
Represented By: Bryan J. Mazzola
Represented By: Juan C. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Bowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Oehler
Represented By: Alison Ellis Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Mulligan
Represented By: Alison Ellis Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?