Van Orden v. City of Port Jervis - PD
Plaintiff: Robert Allen Van Orden, III
Defendant: City of Port Jervis - PD
Case Number: 1:2020cv07207
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Robert Allen Van Orden, III.(sc)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Robert Allen Van Orden, III.(sc)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 10/5/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 10/5/2020. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 10/5/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/4/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP application, #2 Prisoner Authorization) (ees) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, to Robert Allen Van Orden, III, ID No. 202000248 at Orange County Jail, 110 Wells Farm Road, Goshen, NY 10924. (Attachments: # 1 IFP application, # 2 Prisoner Authorization) (dsh)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Port Jervis - PD. Document filed by Robert Allen Van Orden, III. (sac)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Orden v. City of Port Jervis - PD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Allen Van Orden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Port Jervis - PD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?