Shui v. Prodigy Network, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mrs. Shanling Shui and Shanling Shui
Defendant: PN NewCo, Inc., Prodigy Network, LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder Rep Fund, LLC, 84 William Street NewCo, Inc. and 17 John Preferred, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07298
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332ss
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 26 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against 17 John Preferred, Inc., 84 William Street NewCo, Inc., PN NewCo, Inc., Prodigy Network, LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder Rep Fund, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Shanling Shui. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Kramer, Katherine)
October 27, 2020 NOTICE: The initial conference originally scheduled for November 18, 2020 is adjourned to November 19, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Call-In: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code: 3667981. (Nacanther, Florence)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend: Application GRANTED. Time to amend to revise jurisdictional allegations extended to November 3, 2020. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2020.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/9/2020) (jwh)
October 8, 2020 Filing 24 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Shanling Shui dated October 8, 2020. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Limited Interrogatories per DE 15 served on Prodigy Network LLC on 09/23/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 23, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Prodigy Network, LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Limited Interrogatories per DE 15 served on Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC on 09/18/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rongping Wu on behalf of Shanling Shui..(Wu, Rongping)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 17 John Preferred, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder Rep Fund, LLC served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. PN NewCo, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 84 William Street NewCo, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: With 14 days of this Order, plaintiff shall serve limited interrogatories upon the two defendant limited liability companies seeking the citizenship of their members. Plaintiff shall amend its Complaint within 30 days or the action will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/10/2020) (jwh)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981 Initial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/10/2020) (nb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Katherine Burghardt Kramer on behalf of Shanling Shui. New Address: DGW Kramer LLP, One Rockefeller Plaza, Suite 1060, New York, New York, United States of America 10020, (917) 633-6860..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prodigy Network, LLC..(pc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PN NewCo, Inc...(pc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 84 William Street NewCo, Inc...(pc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 17 John Preferred, Inc...(pc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder Rep Fund, LLC..(pc)
September 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 9, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Katherine Burghardt Kramer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mrs. Shanling Shui, 17 John Preferred, Inc., 84 William Street NewCo, Inc., PN NewCo, Inc., Prodigy Network, LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder Rep Fund, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 84 William Street NewCo, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PN NewCo, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 17 John Preferred, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder Rep Fund, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prodigy Network, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 17 John Preferred, Inc., 84 William Street NewCo, Inc., PN NewCo, Inc., Prodigy Network, LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder Rep Fund, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21542105)Document filed by Shanling Shui..(Burghardt, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shui v. Prodigy Network, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PN NewCo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder Rep Fund, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 84 William Street NewCo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17 John Preferred, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Shanling Shui
Represented By: Katherine Burghardt Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanling Shui
Represented By: Katherine Burghardt Kramer
Represented By: Rongping Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?