Wang v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Zhong Wang
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Acting Sec. of DHS Chad Wolf, William Barr, Attorney General William Barr, Director Mark Hazuda and Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv07308
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The application is GRANTED. The deadline for the Government to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended from November 16, 2020, to January 26, 2021. The initial conference is adjourned from November 19, 2020, at 10:30 A.M. to February 4, 2021, at 10:30 A.M. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed at that time. William Barr answer due 1/26/2021; Ken Cuccinelli answer due 1/26/2021; Mark Hazuda answer due 1/26/2021; Chad Wolf answer due 1/26/2021 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/27/2020) (cf)
October 27, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (cf)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to adjourn conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Simon Nakajima dated October 26, 2020. Document filed by William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(Nakajima, Simon)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at November 19, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/5/2020) (cf)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(Byars, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simon Nakajima on behalf of William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(Nakajima, Simon)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. William Barr served on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020; Ken Cuccinelli served on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020; Mark Hazuda served on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020; Chad Wolf served on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Zhong Wang..(Zheng, Taobo)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(pne)
September 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Taobo Zheng. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
September 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
September 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
September 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chad Wolf, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, William Barr, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Zhong Wang..(Zheng, Taobo)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zheng, Taobo)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21573730).Document filed by Zhong Wang..(Zheng, Taobo)
September 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Taobo Zheng to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 9/14/2020. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Sec. of DHS Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Mark Hazuda
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhong Wang
Represented By: Taobo Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?