In Re: 477 West 142nd Street Housing Dev. Fund Corp.
Appellee: Amsterdam Key Associates LLC
In Re: 477 West 142nd Street Housing Dev. Fund Corp.
Appellant: Dr. Queen Mother Delois Blakely
Case Number: 1:2020cv07458
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF, with attached copy of email acknowledgment of receipt from Pro Se Office NYSD re: Automatic Reply: Request for Extension to file Opening Appellate Brief for Queen Mother Dr. Delois Blakley. Document filed by Queen Mother Delois Blakely.Appellee Brief due by 11/27/2020. (sc)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (11 in 1:20-cv-06771-VEC, 12 in 1:20-cv-07458-VEC, 12 in 1:20-cv-07459-VEC). ENDORSEMENT: The Appellant's opening brief is due no later than Friday, December 4, 2020. Appellee's response is due no later than Friday, January 8, 2021. Appellant's reply is due no later than Friday, January 29, 2021. No further extensions will be granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this endorsement to the Appellant and note the mailing on the docket. SO ORDERED. Appellant's Brief filed by Queen Mother Delois Blakely, ( Appellant Brief due by 12/4/2020., Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/29/2021., Appellee Brief due by 1/8/2021.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/28/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 28, 2020 Mailed a copy of #13 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to Queen Mother Delois Blakely at 477 West 142th Street, Suite #2, New York, NY 10031. (dsh)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF, re: request for extension of time. Document filed by Queen Mother Delois Blakely. Appellee Brief due by 11/27/2020. (sc)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. (Attachments: #1 Additional Record from 15-B-12178 (SHL))(bkar)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Document filed by Queen Mother Delois Blakely..(ks)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7 in 1:20-cv-06771-VEC) Remark filed by Queen Mother Delois Blakely, (7 in 1:20-cv-07458-VEC) Remark filed by Queen Mother Delois Blakely, (7 in 1:20-cv-07459-VEC) Remark filed by Queen Mother Delois Blakely, ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby approves the proposed briefing schedule. The Appellant's opening brief is due no later than Thursday, October 29, 2020. Appellee's response is due no later than Friday, November 27, 2020. Appellant's reply is due no later than Friday, December 18, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Appellant Brief due by 10/29/2020., Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/18/2020., Responses to Brief due by 11/27/2020) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/28/2020) (rro)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from J. Ted Donovan, Esq. dated September 28, 2020 re: Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Amsterdam Key Associates LLC..(Donovan, Joseph)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Appellant Opening Brief - 10/29/20, Appellee Brief - 11/27/20, Appellant Reply Brief - 12/18/20. Document filed by Queen Mother Delois Blakely. (sc)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's request is GRANTED. Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Dr. Blakely and note mailing on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/16/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by September 25, 2020, the parties must confer and jointly submit proposed briefing schedules in respect to these two appeals from the judgments of the Bankruptcy Court. Please note that this deadline will not be adjourned. If the parties cannot agree on briefing schedules, each must submit a proposed schedule by September 25, 2020. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Dr. Blakely and note mailing on the docket. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/16/2020) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 16, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Order, #6 Order Granting IFP Application to Queen Mother Delois Blakely at 477 West 142th Street, Suite #2, New York, NY 10031. (kh)
September 15, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
September 15, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-06771-VEC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Queen Mother Delois Blakely. (bkar)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Queen Mother Delois Blakely.(bkar)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-6771. (bkar)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Judgment of Judge Sean H. Lane dated August 11, 2020. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-1126A, 15-B-12178 (SHL). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Queen Mother Delois Blakely.(bkar)
September 11, 2020 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY COURT TO Judge Valerie E. Caproni as possibly related to 20-cv-6771. (bkar)
September 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: 477 West 142nd Street Housing Dev. Fund Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Amsterdam Key Associates LLC
Represented By: Joseph Ted Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: 477 West 142nd Street Housing Dev. Fund Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dr. Queen Mother Delois Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?