Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus, P.C. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff: Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus, P.C., B.F., parent of A.F. and Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus,, P.C.
Defendant: NYC dept of education and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv07527
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Vicky Sprayregen on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Sprayregen, Sharon)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from H. Jeffrey Marcus dated 10/21/20 re: conveyance per Judge's rules of notice of initial pretrial conference. Document filed by Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus, P.C., Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus,, P.C...(Marcus, Harold)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from H. Jeffrey Marcus dated 10/16/2020 re: error in Case Management Plan. Document filed by Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus, P.C., Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus,, P.C...(Marcus, Harold)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: SO ORDERED. (New York City Department of Education answer due 11/17/2020.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/6/2020) (jwh)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on consent, addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Mart Bowe dated 10/05/2020. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Bowe, Martin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(dnh)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus, P.C., Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus,, P.C...(Marcus, Harold)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/15/2020) (jwh) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/20/2020) (jwh).
September 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Harold Jeffrey Marcus to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the 'as to' docket entry text does not exactly match as it appears on the pleading caption; Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
September 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Harold Jeffrey Marcus. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (jgo)
September 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Harold Jeffrey Marcus. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus, P.C; B.F., parent of A.F.; NYC dept of education. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
September 15, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 15, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To AND PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Dept. of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by B.F., parent of A.F., Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus, P.C...(Marcus, Harold) Modified on 9/15/2020 (jgo).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marcus, Harold)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NYC dept of education. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21644339)Document filed by Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus, P.C., B.F., parent of A.F...(Marcus, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus, P.C. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus, P.C.
Represented By: Harold Jeffrey Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.F., parent of A.F.
Represented By: Harold Jeffrey Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Offices of H. Jeffrey Marcus,, P.C.
Represented By: Harold Jeffrey Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC dept of education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Martin John Bowe, Jr
Represented By: Sharon Vicky Sprayregen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?