Henderson v. Sticht
Petitioner: Ted L. Henderson
Respondent: Thomas Sticht
Case Number: 1:2020cv07575
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Ted L. Henderson DIN No. 11A2707 Wyoming Correctional Facility P.O. Box 501 Attica, NY 14011 on 10/30/2020. (ta)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #4 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from Ted Henderson received on 10/30/20. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from Ted Henderson, re: I am writing in regard to a follow-up, regarding the filing fee for a 28:2254 application which was submitted. I would like to know if you received the $5.00 filing fee for the above-menitoned application. I am including with this letter a copy of the disbursement which was submitted to the Wyoming Correctional Facility authorizing payment. Document filed by Ted L. Henderson.(sc)
September 28, 2020 Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers). Transmitted re: #3 Letter to the Finance Unit (Cashiers) for case processing. (jca)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER addressed to Sir or Madam from Ted Henderson dated 9/21/2020 re: I have just received your letter regarding the payment of $5.00 for the filing fee. I have all ready addressed this issue with the Wyoming Correctional Facility. The W.C.F. has assured me that they have sent a check to the U.S. District Court on 09/15/2020. If for any reason the Court has not received the check for the filing fee by the time you receive this letter please let me know and I will address this issue again with the Wyoming Correctional Facility. Document filed by Ted L. Henderson. (jca)
September 24, 2020 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $5.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 9/24/2020, Receipt Number 465401267163. (vf)
September 17, 2020 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Ted L. Henderson, DIN No. 11A2707 at Wyoming Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 501, Attica, NY 14011. (dsh)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Petitioner is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 10/19/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 10/19/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/17/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 17, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
September 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Document filed by Ted L. Henderson. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ted L. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?