ABC v. DEF
Plaintiff: ABC
Defendant: DEF
Case Number: 1:2020cv07599
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0011
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal all documents relating to this action, with the exception of the Petition's exhibits 2-50 and 52-67. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 09/24/2020) (mhe)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
September 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (mhe)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ***Sealed*** ORDER, Case sealed. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 09/16/2020) (mhe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC v. DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?