Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee
Defendant: Aon Investments USA Inc., Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC and Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07606
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 46 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. dated 11/12/2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #43 Motion for Anthony F. Shelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/10/2020) (nb)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING ORDER: The joint initial pretrial conference scheduled for November 17, 2020, will be held via video conference, with remote, listen-only audio access for the public available by using dial-in (888) 363-4749 and access code 5123533. The video link will be provided to participants in advance of the conference. The parties to each case shall file a joint pre-conference letter for that case on or before Thursday, November 12, 2020, as required by the Court's Order providing notice of the initial pretrial conference. The parties need not submit a proposed case management plan at this time. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in case numbers 20-cv-5615, 20-cv-5817, 20-cv-7061, 20-cv-7154, 20-cv-7606, 20-cv-7842, 20-cv-7952, and 20-cv-8642. (Initial Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/9/2020) (rro)
November 9, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Anthony F. Shelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22499308. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Shelley, Anthony)
November 9, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #43 MOTION for Anthony F. Shelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22499308. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 4, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie G Wheeler on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Wheeler, Stephanie)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #36 Motion for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 36. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/8/2020) (rro)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #35 Motion for Amy D. Roy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 35. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/8/2020) (rro)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #37 Motion for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 37. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/8/2020) (rro)
October 8, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22030148. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #36 MOTION for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22029679. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #35 MOTION for Amy D. Roy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22029645. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 7, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Elizabeth Brust on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Brust, Mary)
October 7, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Cole A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22030148. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Goodman, Cole)
October 7, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22029679. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Skinner, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Amy D. Roy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22029645. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Roy, Amy)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #32 Motion for Michael Liftik to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 32. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/28/2020) (rro)
September 25, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/25/2020) (rro)
September 25, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Michael Liftik to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21849331. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Aon Investments USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Liftik In Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Liftik, Michael)
September 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Michael Liftik to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21849331. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among Plaintiff and Defendants, through their respective undersigned counsel, as follows: Subject to the provisions set forth in paragraph 2 below and the reservation of rights in paragraph 3 below, Defendants waive service of the Summons and Complaint, and waive any objections to the absence of a summons or of service in the Action. The filing of this Stipulation shall be deemed the filing of a waiver under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(4). Accordingly, Plaintiff is not required to file proof of service, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure shall apply as though a summons and a complaint had been served on the Defendants identified in this paragraph 1 at the time of the filing of this Stipulation. The time for Defendants to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is adjourned as though the Adjournment Order were entered in this Action and until such time set by the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Counsel for AON Investments USA Inc. is directed to file a notice of appearance in this action promptly. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/23/2020) (rro)
September 23, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Peter Marks on behalf of Aon Investments USA Inc...(Marks, Andrew)
September 23, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renita Sharma on behalf of Aon Investments USA Inc...(Sharma, Renita)
September 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Irving Werder, Jr on behalf of Aon Investments USA Inc...(Werder, Richard)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #24 Motion for Mark S. Ouweleen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 24. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/22/2020) (js)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #23 Motion for Adam L. Hoeflich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 23. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/22/2020) (js)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert)
September 22, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Mark S. Ouweleen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21785580. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Ouweleen, Mark)
September 22, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Adam L. Hoeflich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Hoeflich, Adam)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #21 Motion for Nicolas L. Martinez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 21. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/22/2020) (rro)
September 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Adam L. Hoeflich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Mark S. Ouweleen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21785580. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Nicolas L. Martinez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Martinez, Nicolas)
September 21, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Nicolas L. Martinez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #17 Motion for Sean W. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed also to terminate the motion at docket entry 17. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/18/2020) (rro)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #18 MOTION for Abby M. Mollen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is also directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/18/2020) (jca)
September 18, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05615-KPF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
September 18, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Sean W. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #18 MOTION for Abby M. Mollen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Abby M. Mollen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Mollen, Abby)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Sean W. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Gallagher, Sean)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Nicolas L. Martinez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21710350. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Gallagher, Sean) Modified on 9/17/2020 (aea).
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Abby M. Mollen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21710231. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Gallagher, Sean) Modified on 9/17/2020 (aea).
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Adam L. Hoeflich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21709932. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Hoeflich, Adam) Modified on 9/17/2020 (aea).
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sean W. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21709682. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Gallagher, Sean) Modified on 9/17/2020 (aea).
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Suzanne McArthur on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(McArthur, Kathleen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hilary M. Williams on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Williams, Hilary)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Ostrager, Ann-Elizabeth)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Giuffra, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aon Investments USA Inc.. (sj)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. (sj)
September 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 1:20cv5615. (sj)
September 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
September 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #16 MOTION for Nicolas L. Martinez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21710350. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #15 MOTION for Abby M. Mollen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21710231. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #13 MOTION for Sean W. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21709682. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #14 MOTION for Adam L. Hoeflich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21709932. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavits are not notarized. Re-file each motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aon Investments USA Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee..(Goldman, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee..(Goldman, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee..(Goldman, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-5615. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee..(Goldman, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldman, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Aon Investments USA Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21690015)Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee..(Goldman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon Investments USA Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Peter Marks
Represented By: Renita Sharma
Represented By: Michael Ethan Liftik
Represented By: Richard Irving Werder, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC
Represented By: Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager
Represented By: Amy D. Roy
Represented By: Cole A Goodman
Represented By: Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne McArthur
Represented By: Stephanie G Wheeler
Represented By: Robert A. Skinner
Represented By: Hilary M. Williams
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Brust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Peter Marks
Represented By: Renita Sharma
Represented By: Michael Ethan Liftik
Represented By: Richard Irving Werder, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield Association National Employee Benefits Committee
Represented By: Daniel Zachary Goldman
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Mark Shawn Ouweleen
Represented By: Abby M Mollen
Represented By: Anthony Francis Shelley
Represented By: Sean W. Gallagher
Represented By: Nicolas Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?