United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Rogas et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Adam P. Rogas, NS8 FP, LLC, Rogassi Enterprises, LLC and MVP 2020, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv07628
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Adam P. Rogas served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. Service was accepted by Adam P. Rogas Defendant. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Atkinson, Polly)
October 30, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. NS8 FP, LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Service was accepted by Jolene Ferrier-AFS to Registered Agent Northwest Registered Agent Services. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Atkinson, Polly)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY FREEZE ORDER granting #22 Motion to Amend/Correct, ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/16/2020) (ks) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
October 15, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,, . Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Atkinson, Polly)
September 28, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #22 ASSET FREEZE AND ORDER GRANTING OTHER RELIEF. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ks)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ASSET FREEZE AND ORDER GRANTING OTHER RELIEF granting #20 Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pending resolution of the merits of this matter through trial or otherwise: A. $35,084,900 of assets, funds, or other property of Defendant Adam Rogas and Relief Defendants NS8 FP, LLC, MVP 2020, LLC, and Rogassi Enterprises, LLC, wherever located or by whomever held, and whether acquired before or after institution of this action, are frozen; B. Defendant, Relief Defendants, and their officers, directors, successor corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, trustees, family members, agents, servants, employees, attorneys-in-fact, and those persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this order by personal service or otherwise, and each of them, shall hold and retain within their control, and otherwise prevent any disposition, transfer, pledge, encumbrance, assignment, dissipation, concealment, or other disposal whatsoever of any of their funds or other assets or things of value presently held by them, under their control or over which they exercise actual or apparent investment or other authority, in whatever form such assets may presently exist and wherever located, up to $35,084,900; As further set forth herein. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the Commission may file Notices of Lis Pendens, or any similar document that has the effect of clouding title, on all pieces of real property in which the Defendant or Relief Defendants have an interest that is known to the Commission. Should the Defendant or Relief Defendants wish to sell any piece of real property in which he has an interest, he shall give counsel for the Commission notice of the proposed sale and seek and obtain the concurrence of the Court in the transaction prior to the sale. As further set forth in this Order. The Show Cause Hearing scheduled for September 25, 2020 is vacated. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for all purposes. SO ORDERED, this 24th day of September, 2020.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/24/2020) (ks) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
September 23, 2020 Filing 20 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ASSET FREEZE, AND OTHER RELIEF . Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Atkinson, Polly)
September 23, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Rogassi Enterprises, LLC served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. Service was accepted by Michael Grossa- Registered Agent. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Atkinson, Polly)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. MVP 2020, LLC served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. Service was accepted by Alexandra Nedelcu- Registered Agent. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Atkinson, Polly)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ASSET FREEZE AND ORDER GRANTING OTHER EMERGENCY RELIEF AND SETTING HEARING granting #13 Motion for TRO. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pending further action by this Court: $35,084,900 of assets, funds, or other property of Defendant Adam Rogas and Relief Defendants NS8 FP, LLC, MVP 2020, LLC, and Rogassi Enterprises, LLC, wherever located or by whomever held, and whether acquired before or after institution of this action, are frozen; Any bank, financial or brokerage institution or other person or entity holding any funds, securities or other assets in the name of, for the benefit of, or under the control of Defendant Adam Rogas and Relief Defendants NS8 FP, LLC, MVP 2020, LLC, and Rogassi Enterprises, LLC, and their officers, directors, successor corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, trustees, family members, agents, servants, employees, attorneys-in-fact, and those persons in active concert or participation with them, shall hold and retain within their control and prohibit the withdrawal, removal, transfer or other disposal of any such funds or other assets. This Order specifically applies, but is not limited, to the following accounts as further set forth in this Order. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that service of the Summons and Complaint, this Order, and all other papers and filings may be made upon Defendant, Relief Defendants, their counsel, or agents for service of process, by facsimile, mail, delivery by commercial courier, or personally by any employee of the Securities and Exchange Commission who is not counsel of record in this matter, or special process server, or any other person, or in any other manner authorized by Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant and Relief Defendants shall appear before this Court Via teleconference on September 25, 2020 at 3:00 PM of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, to show cause, if there be any, why this Court should not extend the asset freeze and document protection granted in this Order until final adjudication on the merits may be had. Defendant and Relief Defendants shall deliver any opposing papers in response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than September 23, 2020, at 2:00 PM. Service shall be made by emailing the papers to the Commission's counsel of record: AtkinsonP@SEC.gov. The Commission may have until September 25, 2020, at 12:00 PM to serve, by the most expeditious means available, any reply papers upon the Defendant and Relief Defendants or their counsel, if counsel shall have made an appearance in this action. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for all purposes. SO ORDERED, this 17th day of September, 2020, at 5:06 PM.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/17/2020) (ks) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Certification of Greg A. Kasper Under Local Civil Rule 6.1(d) and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 65(b)(1)(B) re: #13 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Order To Show Cause, And Other Relief.. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Kasper, Gregory)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Eric Day in Support re: #13 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Order To Show Cause, And Other Relief.. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20).(Kasper, Gregory)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Order To Show Cause, And Other Relief. . Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Kasper, Gregory)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Order To Show Cause, And Other Relief. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Kasper, Gregory)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Polly A. Atkinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
September 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Show Cause Response due by 9/23/2020.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Telephone Conference set for 9/25/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (ks)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MVP 2020, LLC..(gp)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rogassi Enterprises, LLC..(gp)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NS8 FP, LLC..(gp)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adam P. Rogas..(gp)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Polly A. Atkinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Atkinson, Polly)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MVP 2020, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Kasper, Gregory)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rogassi Enterprises, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Kasper, Gregory)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NS8 FP, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Kasper, Gregory)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Adam P. Rogas, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(Kasper, Gregory)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(gp) (pc).
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MVP 2020, LLC, NS8 FP, LLC, Adam P. Rogas, Rogassi Enterprises, LLC. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission..(gp) (pc).
September 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
September 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Polly A. Atkinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 17, 2020 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Gregory Kasper for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (gp)
September 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (gp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Rogas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam P. Rogas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NS8 FP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogassi Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP 2020, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Polly Arlene Atkinson
Represented By: Gregory Alan Kasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?