S. et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: H. M., V. P., E. F., J. B., C. B., J. S., C. K., R. R., D. O., H. L., M. D., T. R., R. K., T. D., E. P., C. H., B. R., T. O., Y. S., D. R., S. B., B. B., L. M., T. Y., R. E., M. S., D. G., A. B., E. Z., A. S., P. W., D. M., G. B., M. M., A. F., J. F., K. S., K. Y., A. M., C. D., C. S., A. J., J. C., R. W., F. S., R. J., A. P., N. M., B. P., J. K., G. O., J. E., K. W., W. N. and F. C.
Defendant: Bill DeBlasio, New York City Comptroller's Office, CITY OF NEW YORK, Scott M. Stringer, Chancellor Richard A. Carranza and New York City Department Of Education,
Case Number: 1:2020cv07635
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Gary S Mayerson, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 12, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Lana Koroleva dated November 19, 2020. Document filed by Richard A. Carranza, City of New York, Bill DeBlasio, New York City Comptroller's Office, New York City Department Of Education,, Scott M. Stringer..(Koroleva, Lana)
November 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Gary S Mayerson, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
October 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Gary S Mayerson, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. This request for an extension of time to answer, until November 20, 2020, is GRANTED. Richard A. Carranza answer due 11/20/2020; City of New York answer due 11/20/2020; Bill DeBlasio answer due 11/20/2020; New York City Comptroller's Office answer due 11/20/2020; New York City Department Of Education, answer due 11/20/2020; Scott M. Stringer answer due 11/20/2020. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/16/2020) (mro)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Lana Koroleva dated October 15, 2020. Document filed by Richard A. Carranza, City of New York, Bill DeBlasio, New York City Comptroller's Office, New York City Department Of Education,, Scott M. Stringer..(Koroleva, Lana)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lana Koroleva on behalf of Richard A. Carranza, City of New York, Bill DeBlasio, New York City Comptroller's Office, New York City Department Of Education,, Scott M. Stringer..(Koroleva, Lana)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. New York City Department Of Education, served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. Service was accepted by BETTY MAZYCK. Document filed by J. K. (individually ); C. H.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W.); A. F.(individually ); E. Z.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.); D. O.(individually); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); H. M. (individually ); M. D.(individually); S. B. (on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ); B. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); G. O.(individually); L. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); T. R.(individually); A. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); J. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); F. S. (individually ); H. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); A. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ); R. K.(individually ); K. S. (individually ); V. P. (individually ); K. Y.(individually ); G. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); E. P.(individually ); D. G.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); J. S. (individually ); R. E.(individually); T. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ); T. D.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); A. S.(individually ); M. M.(individually); K. W.(individually); M. M.(individually ); K. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); T. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); H. L.(individually); L. M.(individually); G. B.(individually); N. M. (individually ); C. K. (individually); C. S.(individually ); R. J.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J.); M. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); T. D.(individually ); C. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); W. N.(individually ); F. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.); F. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C.); J. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); E. P. ( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); T. Y.(individually ); D. R.(individually ); A. J.(individually ); D. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); C. H.(individually ); C. D.(individually); P. W.( on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); B. B.(individually ); J. K. (on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ); F. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.); J. E.(individually); T. Y.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); B. P. (individually ); A. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); J. K.(individually ); P. W.(individually ); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); K. W.(on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); J. F.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); D. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.); D. G.(individually ); J. F.(individually); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ); S. B.(individually); H. L.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); L. M.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); W. N.(on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ); K. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S.); R. W. (on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); D. M.(individually ); A. M.(individually); V. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); S. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B.); Y. S.(individually); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D.); E. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); B. R. (individually); R. E.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.); M. D. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); A. S. (individually); S. B. (individually ); R. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R.); E. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); E. Z.(individually); C. B.(individually); M. S.(individually ); A. B.(individually ); J. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); J. K.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.); J. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B. ); E. P. (individually ); E. F. (individually ); B. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R.); J. C.(individually ); F. C.(individually ); R. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R.); C. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); G. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); A. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S. ); Y. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ); A. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ); R. R.(individually ); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S. ); C. D.(individually ); B. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); T. O.(individually ); C. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); K. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ); A. P.(individually ); R. J. (individually); A. J.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); R. W.(individually ); J. B.(individually ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.)..(Mayerson, Gary)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. Scott M. Stringer served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. Service was accepted by BETTY MAZYCK. Document filed by J. K. (individually ); C. H.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W.); A. F.(individually ); E. Z.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.); D. O.(individually); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); H. M. (individually ); M. D.(individually); S. B. (on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ); B. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); G. O.(individually); L. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); T. R.(individually); A. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); J. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); F. S. (individually ); H. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); A. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ); R. K.(individually ); K. S. (individually ); V. P. (individually ); K. Y.(individually ); G. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); E. P.(individually ); D. G.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); J. S. (individually ); R. E.(individually); T. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ); T. D.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); A. S.(individually ); M. M.(individually); K. W.(individually); M. M.(individually ); K. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); T. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); H. L.(individually); L. M.(individually); G. B.(individually); N. M. (individually ); C. K. (individually); C. S.(individually ); R. J.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J.); M. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); T. D.(individually ); C. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); W. N.(individually ); F. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.); F. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C.); J. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); E. P. ( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); T. Y.(individually ); D. R.(individually ); A. J.(individually ); D. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); C. H.(individually ); C. D.(individually); P. W.( on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); B. B.(individually ); J. K. (on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ); F. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.); J. E.(individually); T. Y.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); B. P. (individually ); A. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); J. K.(individually ); P. W.(individually ); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); K. W.(on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); J. F.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); D. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.); D. G.(individually ); J. F.(individually); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ); S. B.(individually); H. L.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); L. M.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); W. N.(on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ); K. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S.); R. W. (on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); D. M.(individually ); A. M.(individually); V. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); S. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B.); Y. S.(individually); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D.); E. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); B. R. (individually); R. E.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.); M. D. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); A. S. (individually); S. B. (individually ); R. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R.); E. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); E. Z.(individually); C. B.(individually); M. S.(individually ); A. B.(individually ); J. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); J. K.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.); J. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B. ); E. P. (individually ); E. F. (individually ); B. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R.); J. C.(individually ); F. C.(individually ); R. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R.); C. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); G. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); A. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S. ); Y. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ); A. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ); R. R.(individually ); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S. ); C. D.(individually ); B. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); T. O.(individually ); C. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); K. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ); A. P.(individually ); R. J. (individually); A. J.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); R. W.(individually ); J. B.(individually ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.)..(Mayerson, Gary)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. Richard A. Carranza served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. Service was accepted by BETTY MAZYCK. Document filed by J. K. (individually ); C. H.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W.); A. F.(individually ); E. Z.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.); D. O.(individually); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); H. M. (individually ); M. D.(individually); S. B. (on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ); B. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); G. O.(individually); L. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); T. R.(individually); A. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); J. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); F. S. (individually ); H. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); A. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ); R. K.(individually ); K. S. (individually ); V. P. (individually ); K. Y.(individually ); G. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); E. P.(individually ); D. G.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); J. S. (individually ); R. E.(individually); T. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ); T. D.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); A. S.(individually ); M. M.(individually); K. W.(individually); M. M.(individually ); K. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); T. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); H. L.(individually); L. M.(individually); G. B.(individually); N. M. (individually ); C. K. (individually); C. S.(individually ); R. J.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J.); M. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); T. D.(individually ); C. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); W. N.(individually ); F. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.); F. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C.); J. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); E. P. ( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); T. Y.(individually ); D. R.(individually ); A. J.(individually ); D. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); C. H.(individually ); C. D.(individually); P. W.( on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); B. B.(individually ); J. K. (on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ); F. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.); J. E.(individually); T. Y.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); B. P. (individually ); A. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); J. K.(individually ); P. W.(individually ); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); K. W.(on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); J. F.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); D. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.); D. G.(individually ); J. F.(individually); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ); S. B.(individually); H. L.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); L. M.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); W. N.(on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ); K. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S.); R. W. (on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); D. M.(individually ); A. M.(individually); V. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); S. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B.); Y. S.(individually); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D.); E. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); B. R. (individually); R. E.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.); M. D. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); A. S. (individually); S. B. (individually ); R. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R.); E. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); E. Z.(individually); C. B.(individually); M. S.(individually ); A. B.(individually ); J. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); J. K.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.); J. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B. ); E. P. (individually ); E. F. (individually ); B. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R.); J. C.(individually ); F. C.(individually ); R. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R.); C. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); G. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); A. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S. ); Y. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ); A. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ); R. R.(individually ); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S. ); C. D.(individually ); B. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); T. O.(individually ); C. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); K. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ); A. P.(individually ); R. J. (individually); A. J.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); R. W.(individually ); J. B.(individually ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.)..(Mayerson, Gary)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. Bill DeBlasio served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. Service was accepted by BETTY MAZYCK. Document filed by J. K. (individually ); C. H.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W.); A. F.(individually ); E. Z.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.); D. O.(individually); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); H. M. (individually ); M. D.(individually); S. B. (on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ); B. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); G. O.(individually); L. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); T. R.(individually); A. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); J. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); F. S. (individually ); H. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); A. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ); R. K.(individually ); K. S. (individually ); V. P. (individually ); K. Y.(individually ); G. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); E. P.(individually ); D. G.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); J. S. (individually ); R. E.(individually); T. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ); T. D.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); A. S.(individually ); M. M.(individually); K. W.(individually); M. M.(individually ); K. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); T. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); H. L.(individually); L. M.(individually); G. B.(individually); N. M. (individually ); C. K. (individually); C. S.(individually ); R. J.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J.); M. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); T. D.(individually ); C. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); W. N.(individually ); F. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.); F. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C.); J. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); E. P. ( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); T. Y.(individually ); D. R.(individually ); A. J.(individually ); D. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); C. H.(individually ); C. D.(individually); P. W.( on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); B. B.(individually ); J. K. (on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ); F. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.); J. E.(individually); T. Y.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); B. P. (individually ); A. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); J. K.(individually ); P. W.(individually ); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); K. W.(on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); J. F.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); D. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.); D. G.(individually ); J. F.(individually); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ); S. B.(individually); H. L.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); L. M.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); W. N.(on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ); K. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S.); R. W. (on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); D. M.(individually ); A. M.(individually); V. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); S. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B.); Y. S.(individually); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D.); E. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); B. R. (individually); R. E.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.); M. D. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); A. S. (individually); S. B. (individually ); R. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R.); E. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); E. Z.(individually); C. B.(individually); M. S.(individually ); A. B.(individually ); J. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); J. K.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.); J. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B. ); E. P. (individually ); E. F. (individually ); B. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R.); J. C.(individually ); F. C.(individually ); R. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R.); C. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); G. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); A. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S. ); Y. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ); A. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ); R. R.(individually ); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S. ); C. D.(individually ); B. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); T. O.(individually ); C. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); K. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ); A. P.(individually ); R. J. (individually); A. J.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); R. W.(individually ); J. B.(individually ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.)..(Mayerson, Gary)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. New York City Comptroller's Office served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. Service was accepted by BETTY MAZYCK. Document filed by J. K. (individually ); C. H.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W.); A. F.(individually ); E. Z.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.); D. O.(individually); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); H. M. (individually ); M. D.(individually); S. B. (on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ); B. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); G. O.(individually); L. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); T. R.(individually); A. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); J. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); F. S. (individually ); H. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); A. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ); R. K.(individually ); K. S. (individually ); V. P. (individually ); K. Y.(individually ); G. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); E. P.(individually ); D. G.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); J. S. (individually ); R. E.(individually); T. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ); T. D.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); A. S.(individually ); M. M.(individually); K. W.(individually); M. M.(individually ); K. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); T. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); H. L.(individually); L. M.(individually); G. B.(individually); N. M. (individually ); C. K. (individually); C. S.(individually ); R. J.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J.); M. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); T. D.(individually ); C. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); W. N.(individually ); F. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.); F. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C.); J. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); E. P. ( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); T. Y.(individually ); D. R.(individually ); A. J.(individually ); D. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); C. H.(individually ); C. D.(individually); P. W.( on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); B. B.(individually ); J. K. (on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ); F. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.); J. E.(individually); T. Y.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); B. P. (individually ); A. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); J. K.(individually ); P. W.(individually ); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); K. W.(on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); J. F.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); D. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.); D. G.(individually ); J. F.(individually); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ); S. B.(individually); H. L.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); L. M.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); W. N.(on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ); K. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S.); R. W. (on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); D. M.(individually ); A. M.(individually); V. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); S. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B.); Y. S.(individually); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D.); E. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); B. R. (individually); R. E.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.); M. D. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); A. S. (individually); S. B. (individually ); R. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R.); E. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); E. Z.(individually); C. B.(individually); M. S.(individually ); A. B.(individually ); J. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); J. K.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.); J. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B. ); E. P. (individually ); E. F. (individually ); B. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R.); J. C.(individually ); F. C.(individually ); R. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R.); C. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); G. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); A. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S. ); Y. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ); A. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ); R. R.(individually ); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S. ); C. D.(individually ); B. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); T. O.(individually ); C. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); K. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ); A. P.(individually ); R. J. (individually); A. J.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); R. W.(individually ); J. B.(individually ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.)..(Mayerson, Gary)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. City of New York served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. Service was accepted by BETTY MAZYCK. Document filed by J. K. (individually ); C. H.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W.); A. F.(individually ); E. Z.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.); D. O.(individually); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); H. M. (individually ); M. D.(individually); S. B. (on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ); B. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); G. O.(individually); L. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); T. R.(individually); A. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); J. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); F. S. (individually ); H. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ); A. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ); R. K.(individually ); K. S. (individually ); V. P. (individually ); K. Y.(individually ); G. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); E. P.(individually ); D. G.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); J. S. (individually ); R. E.(individually); T. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ); T. D.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); A. S.(individually ); M. M.(individually); K. W.(individually); M. M.(individually ); K. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); T. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.); H. L.(individually); L. M.(individually); G. B.(individually); N. M. (individually ); C. K. (individually); C. S.(individually ); R. J.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J.); M. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); T. D.(individually ); C. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); W. N.(individually ); F. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.); F. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C.); J. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); E. P. ( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ); T. Y.(individually ); D. R.(individually ); A. J.(individually ); D. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); C. H.(individually ); C. D.(individually); P. W.( on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); B. B.(individually ); J. K. (on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ); F. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.); J. E.(individually); T. Y.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.); B. P. (individually ); A. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); J. K.(individually ); P. W.(individually ); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.); K. W.(on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.); J. F.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.); D. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.); D. G.(individually ); J. F.(individually); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ); S. B.(individually); H. L.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.); L. M.( on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); W. N.(on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ); K. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S.); R. W. (on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.); D. M.(individually ); A. M.(individually); V. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.); S. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B.); Y. S.(individually); C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D.); E. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.); B. R. (individually); R. E.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.); M. D. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ); N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.); A. S. (individually); S. B. (individually ); R. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R.); E. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); E. Z.(individually); C. B.(individually); M. S.(individually ); A. B.(individually ); J. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ); J. K.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.); J. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B. ); E. P. (individually ); E. F. (individually ); B. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R.); J. C.(individually ); F. C.(individually ); R. R.( on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R.); C. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.); G. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); A. S.( on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S. ); Y. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ); A. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ); R. R.(individually ); A. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S. ); C. D.(individually ); B. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.); T. O.(individually ); C. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.); K. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ); A. P.(individually ); R. J. (individually); A. J.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.); R. W.(individually ); J. B.(individually ); M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.)..(Mayerson, Gary)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard A. Carranza, City of New York, Bill DeBlasio, New York City Comptroller's Office, New York City Department Of Education,, Scott M. Stringer..(dnh)
September 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gary S Mayerson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: P.W.; K.S.; C.H.; R.J.; R.K.; H.M.; M.M.; N.M.; M.S.; L.M.; G.O.; E.P.; R.R.;A.S.;L.S.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CITY OF NEW YORK, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION; NEW YORK CITY COMPTROLLERS OFFICE, BILL DE BLASIO, in his representative role as Mayor of New York City,RICHARD A. CARRANZA, in his representative role as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education,and SCOTT M. STRINGER, in his representative role as New York City Comptroller, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by A. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ), A. B.(individually ), B. B.(individually ), B. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), C. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), C. B.(individually), G. B.(individually), G. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), J. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B. ), J. B.(individually ), S. B.(individually), S. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B.), S. B. (on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ), S. B. (individually ), F. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C.), F. C.(individually ), J. C.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.), J. C.(individually ), C. D.(individually), C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D.), C. D.(individually ), M. D.(individually), T. D.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), T. D.(individually ), M. D. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ), J. E.(individually), J. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.), R. E.(individually), R. E.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.), A. F.(individually ), A. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.), E. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ), J. F.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.), J. F.(individually), E. F. (individually ), D. G.(individually ), D. G.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.), C. H.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W.), C. H.(individually ), A. J.(individually ), A. J.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.), R. J.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J.), R. J. (individually), C. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.), J. K.(individually ), J. K.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.), R. K.(individually ), R. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R.), C. K. (individually), J. K. (individually ), J. K. (on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ), H. L.(individually), H. L.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.), A. M.(individually), A. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ), D. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), D. M.(individually ), H. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ), L. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), L. M.(individually), L. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), M. M.(individually), M. M.(individually ), M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ), N. M.(individually ), N. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), H. M. (individually ), W. N.(individually ), W. N.(on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ), D. O.(individually), D. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), G. O.(individually), G. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.), T. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.), T. O.(individually ), A. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), A. P.(individually ), E. P.(individually ), E. P.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), B. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), B. P. (individually ), E. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), E. P. (individually ), V. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.), V. P. (individually ), B. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R.), D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ), D. R.(individually ), R. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R.), R. R.(individually ), T. R.(individually), T. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ), B. R. (individually), A. S.(individually ), A. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), A. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S. ), A. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S. ), C. S.(individually ), C. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), F. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.), F. S.(individually ), J. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ), K. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S.), M. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.), M. S.(individually ), Y. S.(individually), Y. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ), A. S. (individually), F. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.), J. S. (individually ), K. S. (individually ), K. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ), K. W.(individually), K. W.(on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.), P. W.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.), P. W.(individually ), R. W.(individually ), R. W. (on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ), K. Y.(individually ), K. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.), T. Y.(individually ), T. Y.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.), E. Z.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.), E. Z.(individually)..(Mayerson, Gary)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST 'As To' PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CITY OF NEW YORK, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION; NEW YORK CITY COMPTROLLERS OFFICE, BILL DE BLASIO, in his representative role as Mayor of New York City, RICHARD A. CARRANZA, in his representative role as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education, and SCOTT M. STRINGER, in his representative role as New York City Comptroller, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by A. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ), A. B.(individually ), B. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), B. B.(individually ), C. B.(individually), C. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), G. B., J. B., S. B.(individually), S. B. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ), S. B. (individually ), F. C., J. C., C. D.(individually ), C. D.(individually), M. D.(individually), T. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), T. D.(individually ), M. D. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ), J. E., R. E.(individually), R. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.), A. F., J. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.), J. F.(individually), E. F., D. G., C. H., A. J.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.), A. J.(individually ), R. J., C. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.), J. K.(individually ), J. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.), R. K., C. K. (individually), J. K. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ), J. K. (individually ), H. L.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.), H. L.(individually), A. M.(individually), A. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ), D. M.(individually ), D. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), L. M.(individually), M. M.(individually), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), M. M.(individually ), N. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ), N. M.(individually ), H. M., W. N.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ), W. N.(individually ), D. O.(individually), D. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), G. O., T. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.), T. O.(individually ), A. P.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), A. P.(individually ), E. P.(individually ), B. P. (individually ), B. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), E. P. (individually ), V. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.), V. P. (individually ), D. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ), D. R.(individually ), R. R., T. R.(individually), T. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ), B. R., A. S.(individually ), C. S.(individually ), C. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), F. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.), F. S.(individually ), J. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ), M. S., Y. S.(individually), Y. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ), A. S. (individually), F. S. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.), J. S. (individually ), K. S. (individually ), K. S. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ), K. W.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.), K. W.(individually), P. W., R. W.(individually ), R. W. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ), K. Y., T. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.), T. Y.(individually ), E. Z.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.), E. Z.(individually)..(Mayerson, Gary) Modified on 9/21/2020 (pne).
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK, Richard A. Carranza, Bill DeBlasio, New York City Comptroller's Office, New York City Department Of Education,, Scott M. Stringer. Document filed by J. K. (individually ), J. K. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ), F. S. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.), M. M.(individually), A. F., E. Z.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.), D. O.(individually), J. E., T. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.), B. P. (individually ), J. K.(individually ), N. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ), P. W., H. M., M. D.(individually), S. B. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ), K. W.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.), B. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), G. O., T. R.(individually), A. P.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), F. S. (individually ), J. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.), D. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), A. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ), D. G., R. K., K. S. (individually ), V. P. (individually ), J. F.(individually), K. Y., D. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ), S. B.(individually), E. P.(individually ), H. L.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.), J. S. (individually ), R. E.(individually), W. N.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ), R. W. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), D. M.(individually ), T. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ), V. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.), A. M.(individually), T. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), Y. S.(individually), A. S.(individually ), B. R., K. W.(individually), M. M.(individually ), M. D. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ), R. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.), A. S. (individually), T. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.), H. L.(individually), L. M.(individually), S. B. (individually ), G. B., E. Z.(individually), C. B.(individually), C. K. (individually), N. M. (individually ), M. S., A. B.(individually ), J. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ), J. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.), C. S.(individually ), E. P. (individually ), E. F., C. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), J. C., F. C., T. D.(individually ), C. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), W. N.(individually ), F. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.), Y. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ), T. Y.(individually ), A. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ), R. R., C. D.(individually ), B. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), T. O.(individually ), K. S. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ), C. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.), A. P.(individually ), R. J., A. J.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.), D. R.(individually ), R. W.(individually ), A. J.(individually ), J. B., D. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), C. H., C. D.(individually), B. B.(individually )..(Mayerson, Gary)
September 21, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners J. K. (individually ), A. F., E. Z.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.), D. O.(individually), N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ), H. M., M. D.(individually), S. B. (on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ), B. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), G. O., T. R.(individually), A. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), F. S. (individually ), A. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ), R. K., K. S. (individually ), V. P. (individually ), K. Y., E. P.(individually ), J. S. (individually ), R. E.(individually), T. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ), T. D.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), A. S.(individually ), M. M.(individually), K. W.(individually), M. M.(individually ), T. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.), H. L.(individually), L. M.(individually), G. B., C. K. (individually), N. M. (individually ), C. S.(individually ), T. D.(individually ), C. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), W. N.(individually ), F. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.), T. Y.(individually ), D. R.(individually ), A. J.(individually ), D. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), C. H., C. D.(individually), B. B.(individually ), J. K. (on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ), F. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.), J. E., B. P. (individually ), T. Y.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.), J. K.(individually ), P. W., K. W.(on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.), M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), J. F.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.), D. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), D. G., J. F.(individually), D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ), S. B.(individually), H. L.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.), W. N.(on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ), R. W. (on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ), M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), D. M.(individually ), A. M.(individually), V. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.), Y. S.(individually), B. R., R. E.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.), M. D. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ), A. S. (individually), S. B. (individually ), E. Z.(individually), C. B.(individually), M. S., A. B.(individually ), J. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ), J. K.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.), E. P. (individually ), E. F., F. C., J. C., C. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), Y. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ), A. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ), R. R., C. D.(individually ), B. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), T. O.(individually ), C. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.), K. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ), A. P.(individually ), A. J.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.), R. J., R. W.(individually ), J. B., S. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B.), N. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), E. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), A. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), M. S., P. W., L. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), R. K., C. H., A. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S. ), R. J., F. C., K. Y., B. R., A. F., L. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), D. G., G. O., M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), J. C., J. B., E. P.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), K. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S.), E. F., G. B., R. R., C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D.), J. E., H. M., A. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S. ) added. Party added pursuant to #5 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.Document filed by J. K. (individually ), A. F., E. Z.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.), D. O.(individually), N. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ), H. M., M. D.(individually), S. B. (on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ), B. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), G. O., T. R.(individually), A. P.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), F. S. (individually ), A. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ), R. K., K. S. (individually ), V. P. (individually ), K. Y., E. P.(individually ), J. S. (individually ), R. E.(individually), T. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ), T. D.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), A. S.(individually ), M. M.(individually), K. W.(individually), M. M.(individually ), T. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.), H. L.(individually), L. M.(individually), G. B., C. K. (individually), N. M. (individually ), C. S.(individually ), T. D.(individually ), C. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), W. N.(individually ), F. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.), T. Y.(individually ), D. R.(individually ), A. J.(individually ), D. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), C. H., C. D.(individually), B. B.(individually ), J. K. (on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ), F. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.), J. E., B. P. (individually ), T. Y.(on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.), J. K.(individually ), P. W., K. W.(on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.), M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), J. F.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.), D. O.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), D. G., J. F.(individually), D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ), S. B.(individually), H. L.(on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.), W. N.(on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ), R. W. (on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ), M. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), D. M.(individually ), A. M.(individually), V. P. (on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.), Y. S.(individually), B. R., R. E.(on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.), M. D. (on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ), A. S. (individually), S. B. (individually ), E. Z.(individually), C. B.(individually), M. S., A. B.(individually ), J. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ), J. K.(on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.), E. P. (individually ), E. F., F. C., J. C., C. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), Y. S.(on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ), A. M.(on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ), R. R., C. D.(individually ), B. B.(on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), T. O.(individually ), C. K.( on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.), K. S. (on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ), A. P.(individually ), A. J.(on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.), R. J., R. W.(individually ), J. B., S. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B.), N. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), E. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), A. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), M. S., P. W., L. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), R. K., C. H., A. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S. ), R. J., F. C., K. Y., B. R., A. F., L. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), D. G., G. O., M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), J. C., J. B., E. P.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), K. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S.), E. F., G. B., R. R., C. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D.), J. E., H. M., A. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S. ). Related document: #5 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,..(Mayerson, Gary)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gary S Mayerson to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; if filing an Amended Complaint, the PDF must be titled "AMENDED COMPLAINT". Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the corrected PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
September 21, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 19CV3092. (pne)
September 21, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 21, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gary S Mayerson to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the summons request was not processed due to the deficient pleading; re-file your summons request and link it to the properly filed pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Gary S Mayerson, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gary S Mayerson to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; use 'et al' following the name of the first plaintiff and defendant if all party names do not fit in the space provided. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gary S Mayerson re: Document No. #5 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; M. S., J. B., J. E., D. G., C. D., H. M., A. S., A. S., E. P., E. F., R. K., K. S., C. H., F. C., C. D., R. R., R. J., B. R., L. M., L. M., G. B., P. W., J. C., K. Y., A. S., G. O., S. B., A. F., E. P., N. M., and M. M. must all be added to the case a second time, with party text "on behalf of their minor disabled child" for their respective children. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gary S Mayerson to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; multiple defendant names listed in the docket entry text, but only one defendant is listed in the 'To' field of the summons request PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gary S Mayerson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, against CITY OF NEW YORK, Richard A. Carranza, Bill DeBlasio, New York City Comptroller's Office, New York City Department Of Education,, Scott M. Stringer.Document filed by J. K. (individually ), J. K. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ), F. S. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.), M. M.(individually), A. F., E. Z.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.), D. O.(individually), J. E., T. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.), B. P. (individually ), J. K.(individually ), N. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ), P. W., H. M., M. D.(individually), S. B. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ), K. W.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.), B. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), G. O., T. R.(individually), A. P.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), F. S. (individually ), J. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.), D. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), A. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ), D. G., R. K., K. S. (individually ), V. P. (individually ), J. F.(individually), K. Y., D. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ), S. B.(individually), E. P.(individually ), H. L.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.), J. S. (individually ), R. E.(individually), W. N.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ), R. W. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), D. M.(individually ), T. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ), V. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.), A. M.(individually), T. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), Y. S.(individually), A. S.(individually ), B. R., K. W.(individually), M. M.(individually ), M. D. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ), R. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.), A. S. (individually), T. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.), H. L.(individually), L. M.(individually), S. B. (individually ), G. B., E. Z.(individually), C. B.(individually), C. K. (individually), N. M. (individually ), M. S., A. B.(individually ), J. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ), J. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.), C. S.(individually ), E. P. (individually ), E. F., C. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), J. C., F. C., T. D.(individually ), C. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), W. N.(individually ), F. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.), Y. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ), T. Y.(individually ), A. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ), R. R., C. D.(individually ), B. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), T. O.(individually ), K. S. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ), C. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.), A. P.(individually ), R. J., A. J.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.), D. R.(individually ), R. W.(individually ), A. J.(individually ), J. B., D. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), C. H., C. D.(individually), B. B.(individually ). Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,..(Mayerson, Gary) Modified on 9/21/2020 (pne).
September 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gary S Mayerson to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the first page of the PDF must clearly indicate what type of pleading is being filed (Complaint, Petition, etc.). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the corrected PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** Initial Pleading due by 9/23/2020. (pne)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by A. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ), A. B.(individually ), B. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), B. B.(individually ), C. B.(individually), C. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), G. B., J. B., S. B.(individually), S. B. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ), S. B. (individually ), F. C., J. C., C. D.(individually ), C. D.(individually), M. D.(individually), T. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), T. D.(individually ), M. D. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ), J. E., R. E.(individually), R. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.), A. F., J. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.), J. F.(individually), E. F., D. G., C. H., A. J.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.), A. J.(individually ), R. J., C. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.), J. K.(individually ), J. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.), R. K., C. K. (individually), J. K. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ), J. K. (individually ), H. L.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.), H. L.(individually), A. M.(individually), A. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ), D. M.(individually ), D. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), L. M.(individually), M. M.(individually), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), M. M.(individually ), N. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ), N. M.(individually ), H. M., W. N.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ), W. N.(individually ), D. O.(individually), D. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), G. O., T. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.), T. O.(individually ), A. P.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), A. P.(individually ), E. P.(individually ), B. P. (individually ), B. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), E. P. (individually ), V. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.), V. P. (individually ), D. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ), D. R.(individually ), R. R., T. R.(individually), T. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ), B. R., A. S.(individually ), C. S.(individually ), C. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), F. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.), F. S.(individually ), J. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ), M. S., Y. S.(individually), Y. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ), A. S. (individually), F. S. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.), J. S. (individually ), K. S. (individually ), K. S. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ), K. W.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.), K. W.(individually), P. W., R. W.(individually ), R. W. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ), K. Y., T. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.), T. Y.(individually ), E. Z.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.), E. Z.(individually)..(Mayerson, Gary)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mayerson, Gary) Modified on 9/21/2020 (pne).
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK, Richard A. Carranza, Bill DeBlasio, New York City Comptroller's Office, New York City Department Of Education,, Scott M. Stringer. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21709334)Document filed by J. K. (individually ), J. K. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.R. ), F. S. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.S.), M. M.(individually), A. F., E. Z.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.Z.), D. O.(individually), J. E., T. Y.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.Y.), B. P. (individually ), J. K.(individually ), N. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child P.M. ), P. W., H. M., M. D.(individually), S. B. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.D. ), K. W.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child G.W.), B. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.P. ), G. O., T. R.(individually), A. P.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.P.), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.M.), F. S. (individually ), J. F.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.F.), D. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.O.), A. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.B. ), D. G., R. K., K. S. (individually ), V. P. (individually ), J. F.(individually), K. Y., D. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.R. ), S. B.(individually), E. P.(individually ), H. L.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.C.), J. S. (individually ), R. E.(individually), W. N.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child W.N. ), R. W. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.W. ), M. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.M.), D. M.(individually ), T. R.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child H.R. ), V. P. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child B.G.), A. M.(individually), T. D.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.D.), Y. S.(individually), A. S.(individually ), B. R., K. W.(individually), M. M.(individually ), M. D. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.D. ), R. E.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child D.E.), A. S. (individually), T. O.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child M.O.), H. L.(individually), L. M.(individually), S. B. (individually ), G. B., E. Z.(individually), C. B.(individually), C. K. (individually), N. M. (individually ), M. S., A. B.(individually ), J. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.F. ), J. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child E.K.), C. S.(individually ), E. P. (individually ), E. F., C. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.S.), J. C., F. C., T. D.(individually ), C. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), W. N.(individually ), F. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child O.S.), Y. S.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child R.J. ), T. Y.(individually ), A. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child L.C. ), R. R., C. D.(individually ), B. B.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child A.B.), T. O.(individually ), K. S. (individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child J.S. ), C. K.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child T.S.), A. P.(individually ), R. J., A. J.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child S.E.), D. R.(individually ), R. W.(individually ), A. J.(individually ), J. B., D. M.(individually and on behalf of their minor disabled child N.M.), C. H., C. D.(individually), B. B.(individually )..(Mayerson, Gary) Modified on 9/18/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. M.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. P.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. F.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. B.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. S.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. K.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. R.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. O.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. L.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. D.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. R.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. K.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. D.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. P.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. H.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. R.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. O.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. S.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. R.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. B.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. B.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. M.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Y.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. E.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. S.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. G.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. B.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. Z.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. W.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. M.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. B.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. M.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. F.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. F.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. S.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Y.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. D.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. J.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. C.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. W.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. S.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. J.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. M.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. P.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. K.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. O.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. E.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. W.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. N.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. C.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill DeBlasio
Represented By: Lana Koroleva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Comptroller's Office
Represented By: Lana Koroleva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Lana Koroleva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott M. Stringer
Represented By: Lana Koroleva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancellor Richard A. Carranza
Represented By: Lana Koroleva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education,
Represented By: Lana Koroleva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?