In Re: 60 91st Street Corp.
In Re: 60 91st Street Corp.
Appellee: Heidi J. Sorvino
Appellant: Kim Mortimer
Case Number: 1:2020cv07654
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 12/14/2020. (bkar)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Heidi J. Sorvino. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Vandermark, James)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPELLANT'S OBJECTION(Response)TO MOTION OF CHAPTER 11 TRUSTEE TO DISMISS APPEAL OF CONTEMPT ORDER FOR APPELLANT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH FED.R.BANK.P. 8009, re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Kim Mortimer. (sc)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #9 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings to Kim Mortimer at 60 West 91st Street, New York, NY 10024. (kh)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On October 12, 2020, appellee Heidi J. Sorvino, as chapter 11 trustee for 60 91st Street Corp. ("Trustee"), filed a motion to dismiss appellant Kim Mortimer's appeal. Dkt. 8. The Court adopts the following briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss: Ms. Mortimer's opposition is due October 30, 2020; Trustee's reply is due November 6, 2020. To the extent Ms. Mortimer requires assistance with this task or otherwise in representing herself pro se, Ms. Mortimer is advised to contact the pro se office of this Court, at (212) 805-0175. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to Ms. Mortimer at the address on file. The Court has also emailed a copy of this order to Ms. Mortimer. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 10/30/2020, Replies due by 11/6/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/16/2020) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Heidi J. Sorvino. Responses due by 10/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Motion Ex A (Proposed Order), #2 Vandermark Declaration, #3 Declaration Ex A, #4 Declaration Ex B, #5 Declaration Ex C, #6 Declaration Ex D, #7 Declaration Ex E(pt 1), #8 Declaration Ex E(pt 2), #9 Declaration Ex E(pt 3), #10 Declaration Ex E(pt 4), #11 Declaration Ex E(pt 5), #12 Declaration Ex E(pt 6), #13 Declaration Ex F, #14 Declaration Ex G, #15 Declaration Ex H, #16 Declaration Ex I, #17 Declaration Ex J).(Vandermark, James)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF ITEMS: APPEALING THE ORDER(1)FINDING KIM MORTIMER IN CONTEMPT OF THE PRIOR COURT ORDERS, (ll) GRANTIG APPROPRIATE MONETARY & NON-MONETARY SANCTIONS, (lll) ENJOINING KIM MORTIMER FROM CONTACTING TENANT AND (lV) DIRECTING & ENFORCING ORDERS FOR THE TURNOVER OF BOOKS, RECORDS, AND OTHER PROPERTY OF THE DEBTOR'S ESTATE PURS. TO 11:542. Document filed by Kim Mortimer. (sc)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Kim Mortimer. (bkar)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application to Kim Mortimer at 60 West 91st Street, New York, NY 10024. (kh)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Mortimer is directed, by September 30, 2020, to confirm via letter that she has provided the Court with the full record on appeal, as required by Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a)(1),(4). If the record is incomplete, Mortimer is instructed to supplement the record by that date. If Sorvino wishes to supplement the record, she is to do so no later than October 7, 2020. The Court has emailed a copy of this order to Mortimer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/23/2020) (jwh)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to Ms. Mortimer. The Court will also email a copy of this order to Ms. Mortimer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/23/2020) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 20-cv-4032 and declined by Judge Lorna Schofield and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Kim Mortimer.(bkar)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-4032. (bkar)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Shelley C. Chapman dated August 26, 2020. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 20-B-10338 (SCC). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Kim Mortimer.(bkar)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY COURT TO Judge Lorna G. Schofield as possibly related to 20-cv-4032. (bkar)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: 60 91st Street Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: 60 91st Street Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Heidi J. Sorvino
Represented By: James C Vandermark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kim Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?