Lopez v. Wolensky
Plaintiff: Administrator Luis Lopez and Luis Lopez
Defendant: Kevin Wolensky and Katherine Gorey
Not Classified By Court: Office of the Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2020cv07798
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 ef
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OK. Katherine Gorey answer due 12/18/2020; Kevin Wolensky answer due 12/18/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/9/2020) (mml)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Rebecca Ann Durden dated November 9, 2020. Document filed by Office of the Attorney General..(Durden, Rebecca)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Kevin Wolensky served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service was accepted by Trooper James Buchtman. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Luis Lopez..(DeCaro, Philip)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Katherine Gorey served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service was accepted by Trooper Jacob Salerno. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Luis Lopez..(DeCaro, Philip)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Katherine Gorey, Kevin Wolensky..(dnh)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Wolensky and Katherine Gorey, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Luis Lopez..(DeCaro, Philip)
October 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip Anthony DeCaro to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the party name listed in the defendant 'To:' section must appear exactly as it does in the pleading caption (Remove 'Trpr.'). The wrong Civil Action No. is listed on the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Wolensky and Katherine Gorey, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Luis Lopez..(DeCaro, Philip) Modified on 10/13/2020 (dnh).
September 28, 2020 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information..(rpr)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(DeCaro, Philip)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Katherine Gorey, Kevin Wolensky. Document filed by Luis Lopez..(DeCaro, Philip)
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Anthony DeCaro. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); County code Dutchess; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Bronx; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Philip Anthony DeCaro. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Anthony DeCaro. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Administrator Luis Lopez, Katherine Gorey. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Philip Anthony DeCaro to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
September 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Luis Lopez. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21780071)Document filed by Luis Lopez..(DeCaro, Philip) Modified on 9/23/2020 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Wolensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wolensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Gorey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Administrator Luis Lopez
Represented By: Philip Anthony DeCaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Lopez
Represented By: Philip Anthony DeCaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Durden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?