Lucien v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Leonidas Lucien
Defendant: John Does 1-2 and Emily Williams
Case Number: 1:2020cv08020
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Leonidas Lucien.(sc)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Leonidas Lucien.(sc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fees or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fees due by 10/29/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 10/29/2020. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 10/29/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/29/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Prisoner Authorization) (dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, and an IFP Application and Prisoner Authorization form, to Leonidas Lucien, DIN No. 15A3332 at Fishkill Correctional Facility, 271 Matteawan Road, P.O. Box 1245, Beacon, NY 12508-0307. (kh)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-2, Emily Williams. Document filed by Leonidas Lucien. (sac)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucien v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonidas Lucien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?