Fairstein v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Fairstein
Defendant: Attica Locke, Ava DuVernay and Netflix Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv08042
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332lb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
September 29, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
September 29, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
September 29, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 29, 2020 Filing 64 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Florida Middle; Case Number: 2:20-cv-00180. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDERED: Defendants Ava DuVernay and Attica Locke's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, Joint Motion with Netflix, Inc. to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer #26 , is GRANTED IN PART. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the Southern District of New York and close this Middle-District-of-Florida case. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 9/24/2020. (SMG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Jay M. Cohen as mediator by Linda Fairstein. (Swanson, Kimberly) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke, Netflix, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Price, Kelley) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/24/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 9/24/2020, Discovery due by 1/14/2022, Dispositive motions due by 2/15/2022, Pretrial statement due by 6/14/2022, All other motions due by 6/11/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/15/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 11/15/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2022 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti, Trial term commencing 7/5/2022 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti., Conduct mediation hearing by 1/31/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/4/2020. (jmc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 58 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy: granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of related Cases; PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/4/2020. (Digital) (jmc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 57 ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Related Cases by All Defendants. (jmc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TEXT ORDER denying as moot and without prejudice #30 Defendant Netflix Inc.'s Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to California Anti-SLAPP Act, Cal. C.C.P. 425.16. in light of #54 Defendant Netflix Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal regarding same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/4/2020. (McCoy, Mac) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
August 2, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #14 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Linda Fairstein. Related case(s): no (Swanson, Kimberly) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Netflix, Inc. re #30 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to California anti-SLAPP Act, CAL. C.C.P. 425.16 filed by Netflix, Inc. (Spears, Natalie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, and Joinder in Motion of Defendants Duvernay and Locke to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by Netflix, Inc.. (Spears, Natalie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Kelley Geraghty Price re #51 Reply to Response to Motion by Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Spears, Natalie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Joint Motion with Netflix, Inc. to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke. (Spears, Natalie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Swanson, Kimberly) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 49 PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Swanson, Kimberly) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 48 ENDORSED ORDER granting #47 Motion to File Excess Pages. Defendants Ava DuVernay and Attica Locke's joint reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Joint Motion with Netflix, Inc. to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer (Doc. 26) shall not exceed eighteen (18) pages. Netflix Inc's reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. 28) shall not exceed twenty (20) pages. Both replies shall be filed no later than August 6, 2020. (VK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 47 Consent MOTION to File Excess Pages (Agreed Motion Requesting Leave to File Reply Briefs in Excess of Fifteen Pages) by Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke, Netflix, Inc.. (Spears, Natalie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 46 APPENDIX by Linda Fairstein. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2, #2 Appendix Part 3, #3 Appendix Part 4, #4 Appendix Part 5, #5 Appendix Part 6, #6 Appendix Part 7, #7 Appendix Part 8, #8 Appendix Part 9, #9 Appendix Part 10, #10 Appendix Part 11, #11 Appendix Part 12, #12 Appendix Part 13, #13 Appendix Part 14, #14 Appendix Part 15, #15 Appendix Part 16, #16 Appendix Part 17, #17 Appendix Part 18, #18 Appendix Part 19, #19 Appendix Part 20, #20 Appendix Part 21, #21 Appendix Part 22, #22 Appendix Part 23, #23 Appendix Part 24, #24 Appendix Part 25, #25 Appendix Part 26)(Cheffy, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, and Joinder in Motion of Defendants Duvernay and Locke to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by Linda Fairstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kara Gorycki)(Cheffy, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to California anti-SLAPP Act, CAL. C.C.P. 425.16 filed by Linda Fairstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda Fairstein)(Cheffy, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Lance R. Ribacoff by Linda Fairstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excel Spreadsheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excel Spreadsheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excel Spreadsheet)(Cheffy, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Linda Fairstein by Linda Fairstein. (Cheffy, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Joint Motion with Netflix, Inc. to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Linda Fairstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanne Sinchuk, #2 Declaration of Carolyn Madden, #3 Declaration of Chad Leonard, #4 Declaration of Tim Clements, #5 Declaration of Elizabeth Lederer, #6 Declaration of Patricia Meili, #7 Declaration of Robert Nugent, #8 Declaration of Eric Reynolds)(Cheffy, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiff Linda Fairstein's Agreed Motion Requesting Leave to File Brief in Excess of Twenty Pages filed on June 15, 2020. (Doc. #37 ). Plaintiff seeks leave to file a thirty-page response to Defendants Ava Duvernay and Attica Locke's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Joint Motion with Netflix, Inc. to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Doc. #26 ). Since good cause has been shown and the request is unopposed, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file a response, not to exceed thirty (30) pages in total length, on or before July 15, 2020. Signed by John L. Badalamenti on 7/1/2020. (KDB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587, SECURITY CODE: 20180. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 7/27/2020. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 38 Case Reassigned to John L. Badalamenti. New case number: 2:20-cv-180-FtM-66MRM. Judge Thomas P. Barber no longer assigned to the case. (MLJ) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to File Excess Pages Leave to File Brief in Excess of Twenty Pages by Linda Fairstein. (Swanson, Kimberly) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery Defendants Ava Duvernay and Attica Locke's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reid Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Reid Decision)(Spears, Natalie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Linda Fairstein re: #34 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery by Linda Fairstein. (Cheffy, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery by Linda Fairstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - South Florida Times Article)(Cheffy, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Opposition [sic] and Leave to File Reply Memoranda. Plaintiff must respond to the pending motions to dismiss and to strike (Docs. #26 , #28 , #30 ) no later than 7/1/2020. Thereafter, Defendants may file reply memoranda of no more than 15 pages in further support of the same motions no later than 7/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/18/2020. (McCoy, Mac) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk is directed to add Kiran Patel to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Kiran Patel must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Kiran Patel must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/18/2020. (McCoy, Mac) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Joint Motion with Netflix, Inc. to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #30 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to California anti-SLAPP Act, CAL. C.C.P. 425.16, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, and Joinder in Motion of Defendants Duvernay and Locke to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue by Linda Fairstein. (Cheffy, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to California anti-SLAPP Act, CAL. C.C.P. 425.16 by Netflix, Inc.. (Spears, Natalie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 APPENDIX re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, and Joinder in Motion of Defendants Duvernay and Locke to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue (Appendix of Additional Exhibits) by Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Spears, Natalie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, and Joinder in Motion of Defendants Duvernay and Locke to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue by Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Spears, Natalie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Kiran Patel to appear pro hac vice by Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke, Netflix, Inc.. (Price, Kelley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Joint Motion with Netflix, Inc. to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ava Duvernay, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Attica Locke, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Jacqueline Giannini)(Spears, Natalie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #24 Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. M.D. Fla. R. 2.02(a) requires an attorney seeking special admission to practice before this Court to be "a member in good standing of the bar of any District court of the United States." The instant motion states that the applicant, Kiran Patel, "is a member in good standing of the New York State Bar." This representation does not satisfy the requirement of M.D. Fla. R. 2.02(a). The motion may be renewed in compliance with this Court's rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/18/2020. (McCoy, Mac) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Kiran Patel to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16820968 for $150 by Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke, Netflix, Inc.. (Price, Kelley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER: The "Agreed Motion Requesting Leave to File Briefs in Excess of 25 Pages" (Doc. #22 ) is hereby granted. Defendant Netflix, Inc. may file a motion to dismiss and supporting memorandum of law that does not exceed forty pages, excluding captions and signatures. Plaintiff Linda Fairstein may file a response in opposition that does not exceed forty pages, excluding captions and signatures. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 5/8/2020. (ANL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to file a response in excess of 25 pages by Netflix, Inc. (Price, Kelley) Modified to edit event on 5/8/2020 (MLJ). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting (Docs. #17 , #18 , #19 ) the Motions to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk is directed to add Jacqueline A. Gianni, Esq., Natalie J. Spears, Esq., and Gregory R. Naron, Esq. to the service list; unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jacqueline A. Gianni, Esq., Natalie J. Spears, Esq., and Gregory R. Naron, Esq. must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office, unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jacqueline A. Gianni, Esq., Natalie J. Spears, Esq., and Gregory R. Naron, Esq. must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/7/2020. (JTB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Netflix, Inc.. (Price, Kelley) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Gregory R. Naron to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16787859 for $150 by Netflix, Inc.. (Price, Kelley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Natalie J. Spears to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16787827 for $150 by Netflix, Inc.. (Price, Kelley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Jacqueline A. Giannini to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16787696 for $150 by Netflix, Inc.. (Price, Kelley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Olson on behalf of Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke, Netflix, Inc. (Olson, Eric) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelley Geraghty Price on behalf of Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke, Netflix, Inc. (Price, Kelley) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/25/2020. (jmc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/19/2020 by Linda Fairstein as to Netflix, Inc.. (Swanson, Kimberly) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/19/2020 by Linda Fairstein as to Attica Locke. (Swanson, Kimberly) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/19/2020 by Linda Fairstein as to Ava DuVernay. (Swanson, Kimberly) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk is directed to add Andrew Miltenberg to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Andrew Miltenberg must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Andrew Miltenberg must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/21/2020. (McCoy, Mac) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk is directed to add Kara Gorycki to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Kara Gorycki must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Kara Gorycki must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/21/2020. (McCoy, Mac) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 19, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Andrew Miltenberg, appearing on behalf of Linda Fairstein (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014506.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Andrew Miltenberg to appear pro hac vice . (SPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 19, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kara Goryci, appearing on behalf of Linda Fairstein (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014506.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Kara Gorycki to appear pro hac vice . (SPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-180-FtM-MRM. Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Andrew Miltenberg to appear pro hac vice , #5 MOTION for Kara Gorycki to appear pro hac vice . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (laf) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of recusal. Magistrate Judge Mizell hereby disqualifies himself from these proceedings, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 and in the interest of justice. This case shall be transferred to the next assigned Magistrate Judge in the Fort Myers Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/18/2020. (brh) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Andrew Miltenberg to appear pro hac vice by Linda Fairstein. (Swanson, Kimberly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Kara Gorycki to appear pro hac vice by Linda Fairstein. (Swanson, Kimberly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-180-FtM-60NPM. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael S. Loukonen on behalf of Linda Fairstein (Loukonen, Rachael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Dawn Swanson on behalf of Linda Fairstein (Swanson, Kimberly) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Linda Fairstein with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16604784) filed by Linda Fairstein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Netflix notice letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - DuVernay notice letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Locke notice letter)(Cheffy, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairstein v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attica Locke
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Giannini
Represented By: Gregory R. Naron
Represented By: Natalie J. Spears
Represented By: Kiran Patel
Represented By: Eric S. Olson
Represented By: Kelley Geraghty Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ava DuVernay
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Giannini
Represented By: Gregory R. Naron
Represented By: Natalie J. Spears
Represented By: Kiran Patel
Represented By: Eric S. Olson
Represented By: Kelley Geraghty Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Giannini
Represented By: Gregory R. Naron
Represented By: Natalie J. Spears
Represented By: Kiran Patel
Represented By: Eric S. Olson
Represented By: Kelley Geraghty Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Fairstein
Represented By: Edward K. Cheffy
Represented By: Kara L. Gorycki
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Represented By: Kimberly Dawn Swanson
Represented By: Rachael S. Loukonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?