Aksman v. Greenwich Quantitative Research LP
Petitioner: Michael Aksman
Respondent: Greenwich Quantitative Research LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv08045
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Court has received parties' joint letter and proposed case management plan, Dkts. 18-19, and the parties' letter regarding notice of removal and citizenship of the respective parties, Dkt. 20. In light of the posture of this action and the parties' submissions, the Court cancels the initial pretrial conference presently scheduled for November 4, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/30/2020) (jwh) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jwh).
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Serine Consolino, Counsel for Respondent Greenwich Research LP dated October 27, 2020 re: Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Greenwich Quantitative Research LP..(Consolino, Serine)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Michael Aksman, Greenwich Quantitative Research LP..(Paskoff, Adam)
October 27, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT . Document filed by Michael Aksman, Greenwich Quantitative Research LP..(Paskoff, Adam)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Michael Aksman in Support re: #14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Notice of Removal, #13 Declaration in Support, #9 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 Response, #12 Declaration in Suppo. Document filed by Michael Aksman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Map/Picture of Intersection, #2 Exhibit Local Ordinances).(Paskoff, Adam)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Notice of Removal, #13 Declaration in Support, #9 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 Response, #12 Declaration in Suppo . Document filed by Michael Aksman..(Paskoff, Adam)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Notice of Removal, #13 Declaration in Support, #9 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 Response, #12 Declaration in Suppo. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/13/2020) Replies due by 10/20/2020. (ks)
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Notice of Removal, #13 Declaration in Support, #9 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 Response, #12 Declaration in Support, #10 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam Paskoff, Esq. dated October 12, 2020. Document filed by Michael Aksman..(Paskoff, Adam)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Gene Reilly in Support re: #11 Response. Document filed by Greenwich Quantitative Research LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Oct 2017 RCA, #2 Exhibit B - Mar 2019 RCA, #3 Exhibit C - Oct 2017 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Mar 2019 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - June 2019 Letter).(Consolino, Serine)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Serine Consolino in Support re: #11 Response. Document filed by Greenwich Quantitative Research LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fedex Notification, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Exhibit C - Preliminary Conference Report, #4 Exhibit D - Final Award, #5 Exhibit E - Demand for Arbitration, #6 Exhibit F - Padilla Affidavit, #7 Exhibit G - Cummings Affidavit, #8 Exhibit H. - JAMS Rules).(Consolino, Serine)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD. Document filed by Greenwich Quantitative Research LP..(Consolino, Serine)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Gene Reilly in Opposition re: #4 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Serine Consolino dated September 30, 2020.. Document filed by Greenwich Quantitative Research LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Oct. 17 RCA, #2 Exhibit B - Mar. 19 RCA, #3 Exhibit C - Oct. 17 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Mar. 19 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - June 19 Letter).(Consolino, Serine)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Serine Consolino in Opposition re: #4 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Serine Consolino dated September 30, 2020.. Document filed by Greenwich Quantitative Research LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FedEx Delivery Notif., #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Exhibit C - Prelim Conf Report, #4 Exhibit D - Final Award, #5 Exhibit E - Demand for Arbitration, #6 Exhibit F - Padilla Affidavit, #7 Exhibit G - Cummings Affidavit, #8 Exhibit H - JAMS Rules).(Consolino, Serine)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #4 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Serine Consolino dated September 30, 2020. Opposition to Petition to Vacate. Document filed by Greenwich Quantitative Research LP..(Consolino, Serine)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Paskoff on behalf of Michael Aksman..(Paskoff, Adam)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Granted. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/1/2020) (jwh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 654309/2020..Document filed by Greenwich Quantitative Research LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Process and Pleadings).(Consolino, Serine)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Serine Consolino dated September 30, 2020. Document filed by Greenwich Quantitative Research LP..(Consolino, Serine)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound (#) key, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/30/2020) (jwh)
September 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Serine Rami Consolino. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:10; Dollar Demand $4,030,982,000; Arbitration code m (Mandatory); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1441; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $4,031,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
September 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Serine Rami Consolino to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits to the pleading must be separated and labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Consolino, Serine)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: Index No. 654309/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21890280).Document filed by Greenwich Quantitative Research LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Consolino, Serine) Modified on 9/30/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aksman v. Greenwich Quantitative Research LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greenwich Quantitative Research LP
Represented By: Serine Rami Consolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Aksman
Represented By: Adam Paskoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?