Bizelia et al v. Clinton Towers Management
Plaintiff: Hripsime Harutyuyan, Anahit Matevosyan and Jack Bizelia
Defendant: Clinton Towers Management, Clinton Towers Housing Co. Inc. and P&L Management and Consulting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv08065
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Jack Bizelia, Hripsime Harutyuyan and Anahit Matevosyan 790 11th Ave. #7H New York, NY 10019, on 10/28/2020 Re: #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (aan)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clinton Towers Housing Co. Inc., P&L Management and Consulting, Inc. (aan)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to: (1) substitute Clinton Towers Housing Co., Inc., and P & L Management and Consulting, Inc., as defendants in place of "Clinton Towers Management," and (2) complete the USM-285 forms with the address for Defendants Clinton Towers Housing Co., Inc., and P & L Management and Consulting, Inc., and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. SO ORDERED. ( USM-285 Form due by 11/27/2020., Request for Issuance of Summons due by 11/27/2020.), Clinton Towers Housing Co. Inc. and P&L Management and Consulting, Inc. added. Clinton Towers Management terminated. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/28/2020) (ama) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
October 28, 2020 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 10/28/2020 Re: Judge John P. Cronan #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Clinton Towers Housing Co. Inc., P&L Management and Consulting, Inc. (aan)
October 27, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
October 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/26/2020) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Anahit Matevosyan.(sc)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Hripsime Harutyuyan.(sc)
October 8, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
October 8, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Jack Bizelia, Hripsime Harutyuyan and Anahit Matevosyan at 790 11th Ave., #7H, New York, NY 10019. (dsh)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR Additional IFP APPLICATIONs: Plaintiffs are directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application for each Plaintiff to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 11/6/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 11/6/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/7/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP Applications) (keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Clinton Towers Management. Document filed by Anahit Matevosyan, Jack Bizelia, Hripsime Harutyuyan.(rdz)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jack Bizelia..(rdz)
September 29, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bizelia et al v. Clinton Towers Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hripsime Harutyuyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anahit Matevosyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Bizelia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Towers Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Towers Housing Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&L Management and Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?