Weiss v. Starr Restaurant Organization, LP et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Weiss
Defendant: Starr Restaurant Organization, LP d/b/a Starr Restaurants, 26th Street Restaurant, LLC d/b/a Upland, Moe Larry Cheese, LLC d/b/a Le Coucou, Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC d/b/a El Vez, Train Design, LLC d/b/a Pastis, Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC d/b/a Electric Lemon, Allan Domb, David Robkin, Buddakan NY, L.P. d/b/a Buddakan, SRHG West, LLC d/b/a Veronika, Sur Organization, LLC d/b/a The Clocktower, Jennifer Robkin, Stephen Starr, Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P. d/b/a Mirimoto and Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC d/b/a La Mercerie
Case Number: 1:2020cv08090
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Application GRANTED. No further extensions are likely to be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 14. SO ORDERED., (26th Street Restaurant, LLC answer due 12/4/2020; Buddakan NY, L.P. answer due 12/4/2020; Allan Domb answer due 12/4/2020; Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC answer due 12/4/2020; Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC answer due 12/4/2020; Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC answer due 12/4/2020; Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P. answer due 12/4/2020; Moe Larry Cheese, LLC answer due 12/4/2020; David Robkin answer due 12/4/2020; Jennifer Robkin answer due 12/4/2020; SRHG West, LLC answer due 12/4/2020; Stephen Starr answer due 12/4/2020; Starr Restaurant Organization, LP answer due 12/4/2020; Sur Organization, LLC answer due 12/4/2020; Train Design, LLC answer due 12/4/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/23/20) (yv)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from William Ng dated November 23, 2020. Document filed by 26th Street Restaurant, LLC, Buddakan NY, L.P., Allan Domb, Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC, Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC, Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC, Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P., Moe Larry Cheese, LLC, David Robkin, Jennifer Robkin, SRHG West, LLC, Stephen Starr, Starr Restaurant Organization, LP, Sur Organization, LLC, Train Design, LLC..(Ng, William)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 12. SO ORDERED. 26th Street Restaurant, LLC answer due 11/24/2020; Buddakan NY, L.P. answer due 11/24/2020; Allan Domb answer due 11/24/2020; Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC answer due 11/24/2020; Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC answer due 11/24/2020; Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC answer due 11/24/2020; Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P. answer due 11/24/2020; Moe Larry Cheese, LLC answer due 11/24/2020; David Robkin answer due 11/24/2020; Jennifer Robkin answer due 11/24/2020; SRHG West, LLC answer due 11/24/2020; Stephen Starr answer due 11/24/2020; Starr Restaurant Organization, LP answer due 11/24/2020; Sur Organization, LLC answer due 11/24/2020; Train Design, LLC answer due 11/24/2020. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/28/2020) (ama)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from William Ng dated October 28, 2020. Document filed by 26th Street Restaurant, LLC, Buddakan NY, L.P., Allan Domb, Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC, Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC, Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC, Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P., Moe Larry Cheese, LLC, David Robkin, Jennifer Robkin, SRHG West, LLC, Stephen Starr, Starr Restaurant Organization, LP, Sur Organization, LLC, Train Design, LLC..(Ng, William)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William H Ng on behalf of 26th Street Restaurant, LLC, Buddakan NY, L.P., Allan Domb, Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC, Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC, Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC, Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P., Moe Larry Cheese, LLC, David Robkin, Jennifer Robkin, SRHG West, LLC, Stephen Starr, Starr Restaurant Organization, LP, Sur Organization, LLC, Train Design, LLC..(Ng, William)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for the Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above matter is hereby extended through and including November 3, 2020. There has been no previous request for an extension of time. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the Defendant also agrees to (i) consent to the jurisdiction of the Court, (ii) waive all defenses to invalid service of process and (iii) accept service of the Complaint and all amendments thereon. So Ordered. All Defendants. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/14/20) (yv)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Gregory Weiss..(Lee, C.K.)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by C.K. Lee on behalf of Gregory Weiss..(Lee, C.K.)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The initial pretrial conference that was scheduled for January 8, 2021 in the Court's order of October 2, 2020, ECF No. 5, is RESCHEDULED to January 7, 2021, at 4:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/5/2020) (jca)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Order; Individual Rules of the Court served on C.K. Lee on October 5, 2020. Service was made by Mail and Email. Document filed by 26th Street Restaurant, LLC, Buddakan NY, L.P., Allan Domb, Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC, Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC, Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC, Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P., Moe Larry Cheese, LLC, David Robkin, Jennifer Robkin, SRHG West, LLC, Stephen Starr, Starr Restaurant Organization, LP, Sur Organization, LLC, Train Design, LLC..(Baliga, Shabri)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on January 8, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Within two business days of the date of this Order, Defendants are directed to serve on Plaintiff a copy of this Order and of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, and to file proof of such service on the docket. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to file a notice of appearance on the docket within two business days of such service. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules /ecf-related-instructions. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 2.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/2/20) (yv)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eli Z. Freedberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gregory Weiss. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (gp)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shabri Baliga on behalf of 26th Street Restaurant, LLC, Buddakan NY, L.P., Allan Domb, Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC, Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC, Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC, Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P., Moe Larry Cheese, LLC, David Robkin, Jennifer Robkin, SRHG West, LLC, Stephen Starr, Starr Restaurant Organization, LP, Sur Organization, LLC, Train Design, LLC..(Baliga, Shabri)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eli Zev Freedberg on behalf of 26th Street Restaurant, LLC, Buddakan NY, L.P., Allan Domb, Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC, Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC, Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC, Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P., Moe Larry Cheese, LLC, David Robkin, Jennifer Robkin, SRHG West, LLC, Stephen Starr, Starr Restaurant Organization, LP, Sur Organization, LLC, Train Design, LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Freedberg, Eli)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of NY, County of New York. Case Number: 156909/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21915641).Document filed by 26th Street Restaurant, LLC, Moe Larry Cheese, LLC, Starr Restaurant Organization, LP, Stephen Starr, Jennifer Robkin, Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC, Buddakan NY, L.P., Train Design, LLC, SRHG West, LLC, Allan Domb, David Robkin, Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P., Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC, Sur Organization, LLC, Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supreme Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Laura Ritter, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to the Clerk of Supreme Court, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to Adverse Party).(Freedberg, Eli)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiss v. Starr Restaurant Organization, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Restaurant Organization, LP d/b/a Starr Restaurants
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 26th Street Restaurant, LLC d/b/a Upland
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moe Larry Cheese, LLC d/b/a Le Coucou
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Havatequila Restaurant Partners, LLC d/b/a El Vez
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Train Design, LLC d/b/a Pastis
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ery North Tower RHC Tenant LLC d/b/a Electric Lemon
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Domb
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Robkin
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddakan NY, L.P. d/b/a Buddakan
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRHG West, LLC d/b/a Veronika
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sur Organization, LLC d/b/a The Clocktower
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Robkin
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Starr
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirimoto NY Venture, L.P. d/b/a Mirimoto
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr, Howard Dr. Fine, LLC d/b/a La Mercerie
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Weiss
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?