Biddick v. Lumondi, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scott Biddick
Defendant: Lumondi, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv08091
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332lp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING 45 DAY EXTENSION: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED BY THE PARTIES: Defendant's time to file its answer, motion, or otherwise respond to the Complaint be extended an additional 45 days, until January 7, 2021, to permit the Parties to explore the possibility of an early resolution to this litigation. So Ordered. (Lumondi, Inc. answer due 1/7/2021.) Motions terminated: #9 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Lumondi, Inc. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/22/2020) (rro)
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Scott Biddick..(Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, attorneys for the parties thereto, that Defendant Lumondi, Inc. is hereby granted leave to file its answer, motion, or other response to the complaint within fifteen (15) days of today's date. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/6/2020) (mro)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Jeffrey S. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time . Document filed by Lumondi, Inc...(Kneeland, Mishell)
October 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 AMENDED MOTION for Jeffrey S. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED MOTION for Jeffrey S. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Scott Biddick. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Lumondi, Inc. served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. Service was accepted by Stephanie Katz, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Scott Biddick..(Garber, Todd)
October 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22154044. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): AFFIDAVIT NOT NOTARIZED;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jeffrey S. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22154044. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Scott Biddick. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Goldenberg, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/15/2020 (vba).
October 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so redesignated. (wb)
October 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Nelson Stephen Roman is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garber, Todd)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lumondi, Inc...(jgo)
October 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Todd Seth Garber to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lumondi, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Scott Biddick..(Garber, Todd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garber, Todd) Modified on 10/1/2020 (jgo).
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lumondi, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21915733)Document filed by Scott Biddick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Garber, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biddick v. Lumondi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumondi, Inc.
Represented By: Mishell B. Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Biddick
Represented By: Todd Seth Garber
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?