Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. HSN, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, GK Trading, LLC, HSN, Inc. and Diane Gilman Jean, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv08092
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL TELECONFERENCE: Counsel are directed to appear telephonically for an initial teleconference with the Court, on the date and time listed below. The dial-in and passcode information will be posted to ECF on the date of the teleconference. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/14/2020) (cf)
October 12, 2020 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by GK Trading, LLC, HSN, Inc...(Monaghan, Jr., Patrick)
October 12, 2020 Document filed by GK Trading, LLC, HSN, Inc...(Monaghan, Jr., Patrick)
October 12, 2020 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Qurate Retail Group, Inc. for HSN, Inc.. Document filed by GK Trading, LLC, HSN, Inc...(Monaghan, Jr., Patrick)
October 4, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Alan Burroughs on behalf of Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
October 4, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Maria Zaharia on behalf of Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Zaharia, Laura)
October 2, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick J. Monaghan, Jr. on behalf of Diane Gilman Jean, LLC, GK Trading, LLC, HSN, Inc...(Monaghan, Jr., Patrick)
September 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
September 30, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
September 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
September 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 31 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:20-cv-05448. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCEORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2020. (smo) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Diane Gilman Jean, LLC, HSN, Inc..(Bost, Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 27 Transfer Out Transmittal Letter - Mailed certified copy of Order re The severed claims are transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) with Civil docket Sheet. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO SEVER CLAIMS AND TRANSFER PORTION OF THE ACTION TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (DKT. #25 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED as follows: (1) The claims asserted by Plaintiff against Severing Defendants related to "Subject Design A," as that term is used in Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. 1, Paragraphs 11-16) are severed from this action; and (2) The severed claims are transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a). (3) This Order does not constitute a determination of any other issues. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York filed by Defendants GK Trading, LLC, HSN, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pietrini, Jill) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill M Pietrini counsel for Defendant GK Trading, LLC. Adding Jill M. Pietrini as counsel of record for GK Trading, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant GK Trading, LLC. (Attorney Jill M Pietrini added to party GK Trading, LLC(pty:dft))(Pietrini, Jill) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul A Bost counsel for Defendant GK Trading, LLC. Adding Paul A. Bost as counsel of record for GK Trading, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant GK Trading, LLC. (Attorney Paul A Bost added to party GK Trading, LLC(pty:dft))(Bost, Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE INITIAL COMPLAINT UNTIL SEPTEMBER 16, 2020 (DKT. #21 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before 9/16/2020. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Diane Gilman Jean, LLC answer now due 9/16/2020; HSN, Inc. answer now due 9/16/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Diane Gilman Jean, LLC; HSN, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pietrini, Jill) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill M Pietrini counsel for Defendant HSN, Inc.. Adding Jill M. Pietrini as counsel of record for HSN, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant HSN, Inc.. (Attorney Jill M Pietrini added to party HSN, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pietrini, Jill) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul A Bost counsel for Defendant HSN, Inc.. Adding Paul A. Bost as counsel of record for HSN, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant HSN, Inc.. (Attorney Paul A Bost added to party HSN, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bost, Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Diane Gilman Jean, LLC answer now due 8/17/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Diane Gilman Jean, LLC.(Bost, Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul A Bost counsel for Defendant Diane Gilman Jean, LLC. Adding Paul A. Bost as counsel of record for Diane Gilman Jeans, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Diane Gilman Jeans, LLC. (Attorney Paul A Bost added to party Diane Gilman Jean, LLC(pty:dft))(Bost, Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill M Pietrini counsel for Defendant Diane Gilman Jean, LLC. Adding Defendant as counsel of record for Diane Gilman Jeans, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Diane Gilman Jeans, LLC. (Attorney Jill M Pietrini added to party Diane Gilman Jean, LLC(pty:dft))(Pietrini, Jill) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR 30-DAY EXTENSION FOR HSN, INC., TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT (DKT. #13 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt that the Court grant the extension. As the request is unopposed, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. HSN's response to the complaint is now due 8/14/2020. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to HSN, Inc. answer now due 8/14/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant HSN, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirsch, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin W Kirsch on behalf of Defendant HSN, Inc. (Attorney Kevin W Kirsch added to party HSN, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kirsch, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05448 JAK(MAAx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant Diane Gilman Jean, LLC served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Rios - Agent in charge authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant HSN, Inc. served on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent c/o Lyanne Gares in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Diane Gilman Jean, LLC, GK Trading, LLC, HSN, Inc. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26872510 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Klauber Brothers, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 9/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. HSN, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Represented By: Laura Maria Zaharia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GK Trading, LLC
Represented By: Paul A Bost
Represented By: Jill M Pietrini
Represented By: Patrick J. Monaghan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSN, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A Bost
Represented By: Jill M Pietrini
Represented By: Kevin W Kirsch
Represented By: Patrick J. Monaghan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Gilman Jean, LLC
Represented By: Paul A Bost
Represented By: Jill M Pietrini
Represented By: Patrick J. Monaghan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?