Tag Associates LLC v. Tag Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: TAG ASSOCIATES LLC
Defendant: TAG MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv08096
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin M Wallace on behalf of Tag Associates LLC..(Wallace, Kevin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(dnh)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at December 3, 2020 at 10:40 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney whowill serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (i) to notify all other parties' attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules forthwith, and (ii) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must send a copy of this order and Individual Rules to that party personally. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: December 3, 2020 at 10:40 a.m., to be held telephonically in accordance with the instructions on the first page of this order. And as set forth herein. Initial Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/05/2020) (ama)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Document. The application is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/2/2020) (ks)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lesser, Jacqueline)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File and Accept Corrected Complaint (ECF Doc# 5) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jason S. Oliver dated October 1, 2020. Document filed by Tag Associates LLC..(Oliver, Jason)
October 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Michele Lesser to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tag Management, Inc...(jgo)
October 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacqueline Michele Lesser. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: TAG ASSOCIATES LLC; TAG MANAGEMENT, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason S. Oliver on behalf of TAG ASSOCIATES LLC..(Oliver, Jason)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 CORRECTED COMPLAINT against TAG MANAGEMENT, INC.. Document filed by TAG ASSOCIATES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2020 Barrons Ranking, #2 Exhibit B - 2020 Financial Advisor Magazine Ranking, #3 Exhibit C - 2019 Private Asset Management Nomination, #4 Exhibit D - Printouts from TAG Associates Website, #5 Exhibit E - 2019 TAG Associates Marketing Document, #6 Exhibit F - Certificates of Registration for Trademarks, #7 Exhibit G - Printouts from TAG Managements Website, #8 Exhibit H - TAG Managements June 7, 2019 Announcement, #9 Exhibit I - Printouts from TAG Managements Bill Pay Solution Website, #10 Exhibit J - TAG Managements June 29, 2019 Announcement, #11 Exhibit K - Document re: Acquisition of the www.tagbillpay.com Domain, #12 Exhibit L - TAG Associates June 29, 2020 Trademark Notice Letter, #13 Exhibit M - TAG Managements July 17, 2020 Letter to TAG Associates, #14 Exhibit N - TAG Managements August 3, 2020 Letter to TAG Associates).(Lesser, Jacqueline) Modified on 10/1/2020 (jgo). Modified on 10/5/2020 (jgo).
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by TAG ASSOCIATES LLC..(Lesser, Jacqueline)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TAG MANAGEMENT, INC., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by TAG ASSOCIATES LLC..(Lesser, Jacqueline)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lesser, Jacqueline)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TAG MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21916573)Document filed by TAG ASSOCIATES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Barrons Top 100 Independent Investment Advisory Firms, #2 Exhibit B- Financial Advisor Magazines 2020 RIA Rankings, #3 Exhibit C- Globe Newswire Press Release dated December 16, 2019, #4 Exhibit D- Printouts from TAGs Commercial Webpage, #5 Exhibit E- 2019 TAG Marketing Material Entitled A Family Office Managing Wealth, #6 Exhibit F- Certificates of Registration for the TAG Registrations, #7 Exhibit G- Printouts from TAG Managements Website, #8 Exhibit H- TAG Managements June 7, 2019 Announcement, #9 Exhibit I- Printouts of TAG Managements Bill Pay Solution Website, #10 Exhibit J- TAG Managements June 29, 2019 Press Announcement, #11 Exhibit K- History of the Acquisition of the www.tagbillpay.com Domain, #12 Exhibit L- Trademark Notice Letter, #13 Exhibit M- Defendants July 17, 2020 Correspondence).(Lesser, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tag Associates LLC v. Tag Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAG MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAG ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Michele Lesser
Represented By: Kevin M Wallace
Represented By: Jason S. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?