Jarrett v. American Nurses Association - New York, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karen Jarrett
Defendant: Patricia Kane, American Nurses Association - New York, Inc. doing business as New York State Nurses Association and New York State Nurses Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv08174
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 wt
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Courtney Davy dated October 7, 2020 re: Jarrett vs NYSNA. Document filed by Karen Jarrett..(Davy, Courtney)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference Requesting Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Susan Davis and Olivia Singer dated 10/06/2020. Document filed by Patricia Kane, New York State Nurses Association..(Davis, Susan)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/2/2020) (jca)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Davis on behalf of Patricia Kane, New York State Nurses Association..(Davis, Susan)
October 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Olivia Ruth Singer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff code 7 (NONE); Citizenship Defendant code 7 (NONE); Dollar Demand blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000;. (pc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and accompanying documents served on Courtney K. Davy, Esq. on 10/1/20. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Patricia Kane, New York State Nurses Association..(Singer, Olivia)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York State Nurses Association..(Singer, Olivia)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Singer, Olivia)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 155137/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21941785).Document filed by New York State Nurses Association, Patricia Kane..(Singer, Olivia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarrett v. American Nurses Association - New York, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Kane
Represented By: Olivia Ruth Singer
Represented By: Susan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Nurses Association - New York, Inc. doing business as New York State Nurses Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Nurses Association
Represented By: Olivia Ruth Singer
Represented By: Susan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?