Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc. v. Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation et al
Plaintiff: The Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc. and Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Ernst Wagner and Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation
Case Number: 1:2020cv08180
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: OK (Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation answer due 12/24/2020; Ernst Wagner answer due 12/24/2020.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/25/2020) (jwh)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum dated November 24, 2020. Document filed by Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation, Ernst Wagner..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIRMATION of Cameron S. Reuber in Support re: #15 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc...(Reuber, Cameron)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc...(Reuber, Cameron) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Cameron Reuber. RE-FILE Document No. #13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the document has the Eastern District listed on it. Re-file the document with the Southern District Court on it, using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders. (km)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT AFFIRMATION. Notice to attorney Cameron Reuber to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Affirmation in Support. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the document has the Eastern District listed on it. Re-file the document with the Southern District Court on it. Re-file the document using the event type other answers, affirmation in support of a non-motion. (km)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIRMATION of Cameron S. Reuber in Support re: #13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc...(Reuber, Cameron) Modified on 11/24/2020 (km).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc...(Reuber, Cameron) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 11/24/2020 (km).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Ernst Wagner on October 20, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Reuber, Cameron)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation on October 20, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Reuber, Cameron)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Ernst Wagner.. Service was attempted on October 9, 2020. Document filed by Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc...(Reuber, Cameron)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation.. Service was attempted on October 9, 2020. Document filed by Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc...(Reuber, Cameron)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action having been assigned to me for all purposes, it is hereby, ORDERED as follows: Except as noted in Paragraph 5 below, counsel for all parties are directed to confer,complete and sign the attached "Civil Case Management Plan" and to fax it to the Court within thirty (30) days. The parties are free to set their own deadlines as long as the plan provides for the completion of all discovery within six months of this order and the filing of a proposed "joint final-pretrial order," within forty-five days of the close of discovery. (The "trial ready" date is to be left blank.) If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via fax specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must participate in a telephone conference on 1/29/2021 at 10:00 a.m. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. And as set forth herein. Initial Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/20/2020) (ama)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ernst Wagner..(dnh)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation..(dnh)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Cameron Sean Reuber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc. ; Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ernst Wagner, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc...(Reuber, Cameron)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc...(Reuber, Cameron)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc...(Reuber, Cameron)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reuber, Cameron)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation, Ernst Wagner. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21942824)Document filed by The Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8).(Reuber, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc. v. Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Sean Reuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Rudolph Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Sean Reuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernst Wagner
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rudolph Heritage Foundation
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?