Haxhani et al v. Elsayed III Corp . et al
Plaintiff: Gentrit Qubreli and Kastriot Haxhani
Defendant: Mohamed Al Dyasti, Mahmoud Moktar, Osama Suliman and Elsayed III Corp
Case Number: 1:2020cv08247
Filed: October 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at December 17, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/5/2020) (cf)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Osama Suliman..(dnh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mohamed Al Dyasti..(dnh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mahmoud Moktar..(dnh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elsayed III Corp..(dnh)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OSAMA SULIMAN, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Kastriot Haxhani, Gentrit Qubreli..(Bhushan, Natraj)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MOHAMED AL DYASTI, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Kastriot Haxhani, Gentrit Qubreli..(Bhushan, Natraj)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MAHMOUD MOKTAR, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Kastriot Haxhani, Gentrit Qubreli..(Bhushan, Natraj)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ELSAYED III CORP., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Kastriot Haxhani, Gentrit Qubreli..(Bhushan, Natraj)
October 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Natraj Bhushan to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the caption on the summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 11, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ELSAYED III CORP., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Kastriot Haxhani, Gentrit Qubreli..(Bhushan, Natraj) Modified on 10/13/2020 (dnh).
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Mohamed Al Dyasti, Elsayed III Corp, Mahmoud Moktar, Osama Suliman. Document filed by Gentrit Qubreli, Kastriot Haxhani..(Bhushan, Natraj)
October 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
October 5, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Natraj Bhushan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Natraj Bhushan. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Natraj Bhushan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the docket entry text must list the names of all the parties as to whom the pleading is being filed against. Multiple parties may be selected by holding the 'Ctrl' button. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Natraj Bhushan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: KASTRIOT HAXHANI ; GENTRIT QUBRELI ; ELSAYED III CORP. ; MOHAMED AL DYASTI ; OSAMA SULIMAN ; MAHMOUD MOKTAR. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
October 4, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21971164)Document filed by GENTRIT QUBRELI, KASTRIOT HAXHANI..(Bhushan, Natraj) Modified on 10/5/2020 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haxhani et al v. Elsayed III Corp . et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gentrit Qubreli
Represented By: Natraj Bhushan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kastriot Haxhani
Represented By: Natraj Bhushan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Al Dyasti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahmoud Moktar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osama Suliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsayed III Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?