Onate v. AHRC Health Care, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Onate, Jr.
Defendant: AHRC Health Care, Inc. and Care Design NY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv08292
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint and Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Katherine McClung dated 12/3/2020. Document filed by Care Design NY, LLC..(McClung, Katherine)
December 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Susanne McClung on behalf of Care Design NY, LLC..(McClung, Katherine)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. This application is GRANTED. Defendant AHRC Health Care, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to December 4, 2020. AHRC Health Care, Inc. answer due 12/4/2020 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/10/2020) (cf)
November 10, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Arthur J. Robb dated 11/10/2020. Document filed by AHRC Health Care, Inc...(Robb, Arthur)
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jason S. Giaimo dated November 5, 2020 re: Service of Notice of Order. Document filed by Antonio Onate, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Email Notice of Order).(Giaimo, Jason)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at December 17, 2020 at 10:50 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/5/2020) (cf)
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. AHRC Health Care, Inc. served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Service was accepted by Iris Rosario, authorized person. Document filed by Antonio Onate, Jr..(Gallaway, Brett)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Care Design NY, LLC..(Orbach, Louis)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Louis Orbach on behalf of Care Design NY, LLC..(Orbach, Louis)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Susanne McClung on behalf of Care Design NY, LLC..(McClung, Katherine)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that CDNY's time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until December 4, 2020; as further set forth in this Order. Motions terminated: #10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Antonio Onate, Jr. Care Design NY, LLC answer due 12/4/2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/22/2020) (cf)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint . Document filed by Antonio Onate, Jr..(Gallaway, Brett)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Care Design NY, LLC served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Service was accepted by Tammy Willoughby, authorized person. Document filed by Antonio Onate, Jr..(Gallaway, Brett)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Care Design NY, LLC. (sj)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AHRC Health Care, Inc.. (sj)
October 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
October 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
October 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
October 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lee Scott Shalov. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code (none). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:0201. (sj)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CARE DESIGN NY, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Antonio Onate, Jr..(Gallaway, Brett)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AHRC HEALTH CARE, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Antonio Onate, Jr..(Gallaway, Brett)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gallaway, Brett)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Reed Gallaway on behalf of Antonio Onate, Jr..(Gallaway, Brett)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Scott Giaimo on behalf of Antonio Onate, Jr..(Giaimo, Jason)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AHRC Health Care, Inc., Care Design NY, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21985241)Document filed by Antonio Onate, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Antonio Onate, Jr. Opt-In Consent).(Shalov, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onate v. AHRC Health Care, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHRC Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur J. Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Design NY, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Susanne McClung
Represented By: Louis Orbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Onate, Jr.
Represented By: Brett Reed Gallaway
Represented By: Jason Scott Giaimo
Represented By: Lee Scott Shalov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?