NSI International, Inc. v. Horizon Group USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: NSI International, Inc.
Defendant: Horizon Group USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv08389
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/2/2020) Horizon Group USA, Inc. answer due 1/4/2021 (ks)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Armin Ghiam dated December 1, 2020. Document filed by Horizon Group USA, Inc...(Ghiam, Armin)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Jay Zinna on behalf of NSI International, Inc...(Zinna, Michael)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Horizon Group USA, Inc. answer due 12/5/2020.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/22/2020) (rro)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Armin Ghiam dated October 22, 2020. Document filed by Horizon Group USA, Inc.. Return Date set for 12/5/2020 at 05:00 PM..(Ghiam, Armin)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James E. Rosini on behalf of Horizon Group USA, Inc...(Rosini, James)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Scott Boczko on behalf of Horizon Group USA, Inc...(Boczko, Jeremy)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Armin Ghiam on behalf of Horizon Group USA, Inc...(Ghiam, Armin)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Horizon Group USA, Inc.. Document filed by NSI International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Registration covering the Copyrighted Product, #2 Exhibit B- the "2016 Lawsuit").(Cooperman, Jonathan)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 Letter filed by NSI International, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/9/2020) (ks)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jonathan K. Cooperman dated 10/08/2020 re: correcting clerical error in the filing of the Complaint. Document filed by NSI International, Inc...(Cooperman, Jonathan)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Horizon Group USA, Inc...(dnh)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan K. Cooperman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Powerview Investment Limited for NSI International, Inc.. Document filed by NSI International, Inc...(Cooperman, Jonathan)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Horizon Group USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by NSI International, Inc...(Cooperman, Jonathan)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cooperman, Jonathan)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Horizon Group USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22028436)Document filed by NSI International, Inc...(Cooperman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NSI International, Inc. v. Horizon Group USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NSI International, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan K. Cooperman
Represented By: Michael Jay Zinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Boczko
Represented By: Armin Ghiam
Represented By: James E. Rosini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?