Fiene v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carol Fiene
Defendant: Zimmer Inc., Zimmer US Inc. and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv08589
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
October 15, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
October 15, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 15, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
October 15, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Illinois Northern; Case Number: 1:20-cv-05527. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Southern District of New York the electronic record. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/15/2020.]
October 13, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/15/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Southern District of New York. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/15/2020.]
September 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/15/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carol Fiene by Patrick Francis Bradley (Bradley, Patrick) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/15/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Carol Fiene; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17450191. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradley, Patrick) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiene v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Fiene
Represented By: Patrick Francis Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?