Mtume v. Sony Music Entertainment
Plaintiff: James Mtume
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment
Case Number: 1:2020cv08648
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 cp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sony Music Entertainment..(Bart, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Harrison Bart on behalf of Sony Music Entertainment..(Bart, Andrew)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Related Case Statement and AO 121 Copyright Form served on Sony Music Entertainment on October 22, 2020. Service was accepted by Andrew H. Bart, Counsel for Sony Music Entertainment. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by James Mtume..(Silverman, Zachary)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Winthrop Silverman on behalf of James Mtume..(Silverman, Zachary)
October 21, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-06037-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
October 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for David B. Rosemberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22226592. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Mtume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Declaration of David B. Rosemberg, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rosemberg, David)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lucks, Steven)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-06037 (ER). Document filed by James Mtume..(Lucks, Steven)
October 20, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for David B. Rosemberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22226592. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sony Music Entertainment..(jgo)
October 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Steven Miles Lucks, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
October 19, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
October 19, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 18-cv-6037. (jgo)
October 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lucks, Steven)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sony Music Entertainment, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by James Mtume..(Lucks, Steven)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sony Music Entertainment. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22176056)Document filed by James Mtume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2018 Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Sony Letter, 10-8-2020).(Lucks, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mtume v. Sony Music Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mtume
Represented By: Steven Miles Lucks
Represented By: David B. Rosemberg
Represented By: Zachary Winthrop Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?