Singh v. Decker et al
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Respondent: Thomas Decker, William Barr, Michael M. Russo and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv09089
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction/venue, or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey. . Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker, Michael M. Russo, Chad Wolf..(Byars, Michael)
December 18, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction/venue, or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey. . Document filed by Gurpreet Singh..(Miedel, Florian)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Letter Notifying the Court of intent to file brief filed by Gurpreet Singh. ENDORSEMENT : Petitioner may file a memorandum in support of his petition by December 18, 2020. SO ORDERED., ( Replies due by 12/18/2020.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/14/20) (yv)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Florian Miedel dated 12-14-2020 re: Notifying the Court of intent to file brief. Document filed by Gurpreet Singh..(Miedel, Florian)
December 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Florian Miedel on behalf of Gurpreet Singh..(Miedel, Florian)
December 8, 2020 Mailed a copy of #13 Order on Application to Appoint Counsel (Habeas Corpus Case), to Gurpreet Singh, A-059-898-100, E 39296 at 160 South River Street, Hackansack, NJ 07601. (dsh)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: granting #3 Application to Appoint Counsel pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006(A)(g)(Habeas Corpus Petition). For the foregoing reasons, the Clerk of Court is directed to appoint counsel for Petitioner from this District's Habeas Panel.The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this Order to Petitioner. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/08/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of Pro Se Litigation for processing.
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Declaration of Deportation Officer Christopher H. Schultz, and Memorandum of Law, together with copies of unpublished cases cited therein served on Gurpreet Singh on November 30, 2020. Service was made by certified U.S. Mail. Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker, Michael M. Russo, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certified U.S. Mail receipt).(Byars, Michael)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction/venue, or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey. . Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker, Michael M. Russo, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, Patzan Chamale v. U.S. DHS, No. 20 Civ. 3517 (PAE) ECF No. 5, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript, Gomez v. Decker, No. 18 Civ. 4009 (KPF), #3 Exhibit C - Transcript, Thomas v. Decker, No. 19 Civ. 8690 (JMF)).(Byars, Michael)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Deportation Officer Christopher H. Schultz in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction/venue, or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey.. Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker, Michael M. Russo, Chad Wolf..(Byars, Michael)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction/venue, or in the alternative., MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey. Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker, Michael M. Russo, Chad Wolf..(Byars, Michael)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Decker, Michael M. Russo, Chad Wolf..(Byars, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 HABEAS PACKAGE MAILED to Gurpreet Singh A-059-898-100 E 39296 160 South River Street Hackansack, NJ 07601, at, on 11/6/2020 Re: #5 Order to Answer, 28 U.S.C. 2241. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (aan)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/6/2020) (rjm)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2241. The Court, having examined the petition in this action, which Petitioner filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, hereby ORDERS that: The Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the Civil Division of the U.S. Attorneys Office for the Southern District of New York that this order has been issued. Within sixty days of the date of this order, the U.S. Attorney's Office shall file an answer or other pleading in response to the petition. Petitioner may file reply papers, if any, within thirty days from the date Petitioner is served with Respondents' answer. SO ORDERED. William Barr answer due on 1/5/2021; Thomas Decker answer due on 1/5/2021; Michael M. Russo answer due on 1/5/2021; Chad Wolf answer due on 1/5/2021. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/6/2020) (rjm). Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
November 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
November 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 PETITIONER PRO SE REQUEST FOR ASSIGNING OF COUNSEL. Document filed by Singh Gurpreet..(rdz)
October 29, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael M. Russo
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Represented By: Florian Miedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?