Colin D. et al v. Morgan Stanley Medical Plan et al
Plaintiff: Joseph D. and Colin D.
Defendant: Optum Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley Medical Plan and United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv09120
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to January 19, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (GWG)
December 23, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jovana Vujovic on behalf of Morgan Stanley Medical Plan, Optum Group, LLC, United Behavioral Health, Inc...(Vujovic, Jovana)
December 23, 2020 Filing 25 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Defendants dated December 23, 2020. Document filed by Morgan Stanley Medical Plan, Optum Group, LLC, United Behavioral Health, Inc...(Bernstein, Michael)
December 23, 2020 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for United Behavioral Health, Inc.. Document filed by United Behavioral Health, Inc...(Bernstein, Michael)
December 23, 2020 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Optum Group, LLC. Document filed by Optum Group, LLC..(Bernstein, Michael)
December 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael H Bernstein on behalf of Morgan Stanley Medical Plan, Optum Group, LLC, United Behavioral Health, Inc...(Bernstein, Michael)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE: granting #14 Motion for Lydia JoAnn Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/07/2020) (ama)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE: granting #13 Motion for Richard Leon Denney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/07/2020) (ama)
November 25, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. United Behavioral Health, Inc. waiver sent on 11/6/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. Document filed by Joseph D.; Colin D.; Joseph D...(Maddox, Matthew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Optum Group, LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. Document filed by Joseph D.; Colin D.; Joseph D...(Maddox, Matthew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joseph D., Colin D., Joseph D...(Maddox, Matthew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Morgan Stanley Medical Plan waiver sent on 11/6/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. Document filed by Colin D...(Maddox, Matthew)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. Motions referred to Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/24/2020) (jwh)
November 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 FIRST MOTION for Lydia JoAnn Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #13 FIRST MOTION for Richard Leon Denney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST MOTION for Lydia JoAnn Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Colin D., Joseph D., Joseph D.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Barrett, Lydia)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST MOTION for Richard Leon Denney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Colin D., Joseph D., Joseph D.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Denney, Richard)
November 12, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 FIRST MOTION for Richard Leon Denney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22532885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #12 FIRST MOTION for Lydia JoAnn Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22533124. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Oklahoma;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
November 11, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - FIRST MOTION for Lydia JoAnn Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22533124. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Colin D., Joseph D., Joseph D.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Barrett, Lydia) Modified on 11/12/2020 (wb).
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - FIRST MOTION for Richard Leon Denney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22532885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Colin D., Joseph D., Joseph D.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Denney, Richard) Modified on 11/12/2020 (wb).
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgan Stanley Medical Plan..(pc)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Optum Group, LLC..(pc)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Behavioral Health, Inc...(pc)
November 2, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Joseph D. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Joseph D.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Riemer, Scott)
November 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott Madison Riemer re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Joseph D. to CM ECF with the party text "as guardian of Colin D.". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
November 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Madison Riemer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Morgan Stanley Medical Plan, Optum Group, LLC, United Behavioral Health, Inc., Colin D., Joseph D.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Behavioral Health, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Colin D., Joseph D...(Maddox, Matthew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Optum Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Colin D., Joseph D...(Maddox, Matthew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morgan Stanley Medical Plan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Colin D., Joseph D...(Maddox, Matthew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Robert Maddox on behalf of Colin D., Joseph D...(Maddox, Matthew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lynn Hess on behalf of Colin D., Joseph D...(Hess, Jennifer)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Riemer, Scott)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morgan Stanley Medical Plan, Optum Group, LLC, United Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22391395)Document filed by Colin D., Joseph D...(Riemer, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colin D. et al v. Morgan Stanley Medical Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph D.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Hess
Represented By: Scott Madison Riemer
Represented By: Matthew Robert Maddox
Represented By: Richard L Denney
Represented By: Lydia JoAnn Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin D.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Hess
Represented By: Scott Madison Riemer
Represented By: Matthew Robert Maddox
Represented By: Richard L Denney
Represented By: Lydia JoAnn Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael H Bernstein
Represented By: Jovana Vujovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Medical Plan
Represented By: Michael H Bernstein
Represented By: Jovana Vujovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H Bernstein
Represented By: Jovana Vujovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?