Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. Brouillette et al
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Sierra Club, Natural Resources Defense Council, Center For Biological Diversity, Consumer Federation of America and Public Citizen
Defendant: Dan Brouillette and United States Department of Energy
Case Number: 1:2020cv09127
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 6201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Talia Kraemer on behalf of Dan Brouillette, United States Department of Energy..(Kraemer, Talia)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dan Brouillette served on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021; United States Department of Energy served on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sierra Club; Consumer Federation of America; Center For Biological Diversity; Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants; Natural Resources Defense Council; Public Citizen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Keltner Affidavit (Brouillette), #2 Exhibit B - USPS Tracking (Brouillette), #3 Exhibit C - Keltner Affidavit (DOE), #4 Exhibit D - USPS Tracking (DOE), #5 Exhibit E - Keltner Affidavit (USAG), #6 Exhibit F - USPS Tracking (USAG), #7 Exhibit G - Keltner Affidavit (AUSA), #8 Exhibit H - USPS Tracking (AUSA)).(Knicley, Jared)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, February 5, 2021 at 3:45 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/19/2020) (rjm)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Timothy Ballo to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
November 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Timothy Ballo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Timothy Ballo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Consumer Federation of America, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing in Supreme Court of VA, #4 Certificate of Good Standing DC Bar).(Ballo, Timothy)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Energy. (sj)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dan Brouillette. (sj)
November 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 2, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for Timothy Ballo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22395314. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF VIRGINIA;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Timothy Ballo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22395314. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Consumer Federation of America, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 VA Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Ballo, Timothy) Modified on 11/2/2020 (vba).
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Jared E. Knicley to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiffs Natural Resources Defense Council and Public Citizen. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22392852. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jared E. Knicley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Knicley, Jared)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Energy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Consumer Federation of America, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Sierra Club..(Knicley, Jared)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dan Brouillette, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Energy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Consumer Federation of America, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Sierra Club..(Knicley, Jared)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Consumer Federation of America, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Sierra Club..(Knicley, Jared)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Knicley, Jared)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dan Brouillette, United States Department of Energy. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22392051)Document filed by Sierra Club, Consumer Federation of America, Center For Biological Diversity, Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Letter).(Knicley, Jared)
October 30, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Jared E. Knicley to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiffs Natural Resources Defense Council and Public Citizen. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22392852. Motion and supporting papers to. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. Brouillette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Union of Public Housing Tenants
Represented By: Timothy D. Ballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Timothy D. Ballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Jared Eldridge Knicley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Timothy D. Ballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consumer Federation of America
Represented By: Timothy D. Ballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Citizen
Represented By: Jared Eldridge Knicley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Brouillette
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Energy
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?