Cid Hurtado et al v. Hudson Fulton Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Victor Peguero, Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel and Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado
Defendant: Thomas Bosco, Hudson Fulton Corp. (d/b/a Indian Road Cafe), Jason Minter and Hudson Fulton Corp. doing business as Indian Road Cafe
Case Number: 1:2020cv09133
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Thomas Bosco.(km)
December 10, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Joshua S. Androphy in Support re: #17 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,. Document filed by Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(individually), Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(individually), Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(On behalf of others similarly situated), Victor Peguero(individually), Victor Peguero(On behalf of others similarly situated)..(Androphy, Joshua)
December 10, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(individually), Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(individually), Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(On behalf of others similarly situated), Victor Peguero(individually), Victor Peguero(On behalf of others similarly situated)..(Androphy, Joshua) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION, STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel for plaintiffs, JHON JAIRO CID HURTADO, VICTOR PEGUERO, and ALBERTO DE LA ROSA VOLQUEZ ROMEL, and defendants, HUDSONFULTONCORP. and JASON MINTER, that the time for JASON MINTER and HUDSON FULTON CORP. to answer the Summons and Complaint in this action dated November 2, 2020, is hereby extended to January 5, 2021, and the statute of limitations regarding putative class member claims is tolled from November 2, 2020 to January 5, 2021, and that an order consistent with this Stipulation be entered without further notice. SO ORDERED. Hudson Fulton Corp. answer due 1/5/2021; Jason Minter answer due 1/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/3/2020) (kv)
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(individually), Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(individually), Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(On behalf of others similarly situated), Victor Peguero(individually), Victor Peguero(On behalf of others similarly situated)..(Androphy, Joshua)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Thomas Bosco served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. Service was accepted by Thomas Bosco, individual defendant. Document filed by Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(individually); Victor Peguero(individually); Victor Peguero(On behalf of others similarly situated); Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(individually); Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(On behalf of others similarly situated); Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Morrison, Lawrence)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jason Minter served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(individually); Victor Peguero(individually); Victor Peguero(On behalf of others similarly situated); Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(individually); Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(On behalf of others similarly situated); Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Morrison, Lawrence)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hudson Fulton Corp. served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, an authorized agent in the Secretary of State. Document filed by Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(individually); Victor Peguero(individually); Victor Peguero(On behalf of others similarly situated); Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(individually); Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel(On behalf of others similarly situated); Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Morrison, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel, Victor Peguero, Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Victor Peguero, Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel, Victor Peguero, Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Victor Peguero, Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Androphy, Joshua)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Minter. (sj)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Bosco. (sj)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hudson Fulton Corp.. (sj)
November 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua S. Androphy to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filers were selected; Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado; Victor Peguero and Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel must be added again on behalf of others similarly situated. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
November 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua S. Androphy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado; Victor Peguero; Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel; Hudson Fulton Corp.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Bosco, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel, Victor Peguero..(Morrison, Lawrence)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Minter, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel, Victor Peguero..(Morrison, Lawrence)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hudson Fulton Corp. (d/b/a Indian Road Cafe), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel, Victor Peguero..(Morrison, Lawrence)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Androphy, Joshua)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Bosco, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel, Victor Peguero..(Androphy, Joshua) Modified on 11/2/2020 (jgo).
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Minter, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel, Victor Peguero..(Androphy, Joshua) Modified on 11/2/2020 (jgo).
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hudson Fulton Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel, Victor Peguero..(Androphy, Joshua) Modified on 11/2/2020 (jgo).
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Thomas Bosco, Hudson Fulton Corp. (d/b/a Indian Road Cafe), Jason Minter. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22393833)Document filed by Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado, Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel, Victor Peguero..(Androphy, Joshua) Modified on 11/2/2020 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cid Hurtado et al v. Hudson Fulton Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Peguero
Represented By: Joshua S. Androphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto De La Rosa Volquez Romel
Represented By: Joshua S. Androphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jhon Jairo Cid Hurtado
Represented By: Joshua S. Androphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bosco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Fulton Corp. (d/b/a Indian Road Cafe)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Fulton Corp. doing business as Indian Road Cafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?