Hucks et al v. Local Union 306 I.A.T.S.E.
Plaintiff: Chryome Bethea, Vernal Green and Curtis Hucks
Defendant: Local Union 306 I.A.T.S.E.
Case Number: 1:2020cv09305
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gillian Costello on behalf of Local Union 306 I.A.T.S.E...(Costello, Gillian)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric R. Greene on behalf of Local Union 306 I.A.T.S.E...(Greene, Eric)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lydia Angela Sigelakis on behalf of Local Union 306 I.A.T.S.E...(Sigelakis, Lydia)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Local Union 306 I.A.T.S.E...(dnh)
November 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
November 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christopher J. Berlingieri to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Only one origin may be selected. There was no Basis of Jurisdiction selected. The plaintiff and defendant addresses were omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LOCAL UNION 306, I.A.T.S.E., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chryome Bethea, Vernal Green, Curtis Hucks..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berlingieri, Christopher) Modified on 11/6/2020 (dnh).
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Local Union 306 I.A.T.S.E.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22457711)Document filed by Curtis Hucks, Vernal Green, Chryome Bethea..(Berlingieri, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hucks et al v. Local Union 306 I.A.T.S.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chryome Bethea
Represented By: Christopher J. Berlingieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernal Green
Represented By: Christopher J. Berlingieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Hucks
Represented By: Christopher J. Berlingieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Union 306 I.A.T.S.E.
Represented By: Eric R. Greene
Represented By: Gillian Costello
Represented By: Lydia Angela Sigelakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?