Hilton v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hilton
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv09318
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Referring Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jennifer Hilton, Andrew Saul. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. IT IS ORDERED: This case is referred to a United states magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/4/21) (yv)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: #7 Order. Pursuant to the Court's Order dated November 9, 2020, the parties were required to confer regarding whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. See ECF No. 7. If both parties consent, they were required to email to Furman NYSDChambers@nysd.uscomts.gov a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance. If either party does not consent, they were to file, by the same date, a joint letter advising the Court that the parties do not consent. To date, the parties have not satisfied their obligations. As a courtesy, the parties' deadline is hereby EXTENDED, nunc pro tunc, to January 5, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/29/2020) (kv)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nahid Sorooshyari on behalf of Andrew Saul..(Sorooshyari, Nahid)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Appeals Council Denial. Andrew Saul served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. Service was accepted by Elethia Perez. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jennifer Hilton. (tro)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SUPPLEMENTING STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASE (Represented Parties): The above-referenced social security action has been referred to the undersigned for Report and Recommendation. All motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and all motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, must be made to Judge Lehrburger and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-robert-w-lehrburger. Pursuant to Standing Order No. 16-MC-00171, datedApril 20, 2016, Defendant shall file the electronic certified transcript of the administrative record ("Record"), which shall constitute the Defendant's answer, or move against the complaint, no later than 90 days after Defendant is served with process or otherwise directed by the Court to answer in this action. Thereafter, in order to promote the efficient adjudication of this matter, the parties shall adhere to the following schedule and procedures and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 11/9/2020) Copies transmitted this date to all counsel of record. (rro)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. In accordance with this District's Standing Order governing challenges to denials of social security benefits (see In re: Mots. J. Pleadings Social Sec. Cases, 16-MC-0171), the following briefing scheduleapplies as further set forth in this Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant must, within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, either mail or email to Furman_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this Order (and also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754). If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before the undersigned. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. There will be no adverse consequences if the parties do not consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/9/20) (yv)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/9/2020) (rjm)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul..(pc)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pc)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Albert Romano. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jennifer Hilton, Andrew Saul. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Saul, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jennifer Hilton..(Romano, Joseph)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Romano, Joseph)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22466827)Document filed by Jennifer Hilton..(Romano, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilton v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nahid Sorooshyari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hilton
Represented By: Joseph Albert Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?