Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. v. United Health Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. and Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. as the Assignee of various Patients named in the within complaint
Defendant: Oxford Health Plans LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Health Group Inc., Optum, Inc., Optum Group, LLC, Aetna Life Insurance Group, Aetna Health Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Aetna Health Insurance Company of New York, United Healthcare Service LLC and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv09333
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amit Kumar on behalf of Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C., Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. as the Assignee of various Patients named in the within complaint..(Kumar, Amit)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew S. Blum on behalf of Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C., Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. as the Assignee of various Patients named in the within complaint..(Blum, Matthew)
November 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
November 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
November 23, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:16-cv-05265-JPO. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:16-cv-05265-JPO. Document filed by Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C., Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. as the Assignee of various Patients named in the within complaint..(Cafaro, William)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:16-cv-05265-JPO. Document filed by Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C., Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. as the Assignee of various Patients named in the within complaint..(Cafaro, William)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company of New York, Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Life Insurance Group, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., Oxford Health Plans LLC, United Health Group Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Service LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Document filed by Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. as the Assignee of various Patients named in the within complaint..(Cafaro, William)
November 9, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. as the Assignee of various Patients named in the within complaint added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. as the Assignee of various Patients named in the within complaint. Related document: #1 Complaint,,..(Cafaro, William)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company of New York, Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Life Insurance Group, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., Oxford Health Plans LLC, United Health Group Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Service LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (sj)
November 9, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge J. Paul Oetken as possibly related to 1:16cv5265. (sj)
November 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
November 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney William Cafaro, Sr, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
November 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney William Cafaro, Sr to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. must be added again with text, as the Assignee of various Patients named in the within complaint. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
November 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Scott Buzin on behalf of Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C...(Buzin, Andrew)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Health Group Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Service LLC, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., Oxford Health Plans LLC, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company of New York, Aetna Life Insurance Company and Aetna Life Insurance Group, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C...(Cafaro, William)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cafaro, William)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company of New York, Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Life Insurance Group, Optum Group, LLC, Optum, Inc., Oxford Health Plans LLC, United Health Group Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Service LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22473002)Document filed by Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C...(Cafaro, William) Modified on 11/9/2020 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. v. United Health Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Health Plans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C.
Represented By: William Cafaro, Sr
Represented By: Amit Kumar
Represented By: Matthew S. Blum
Represented By: Andrew Scott Buzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Podiatric OR Of Midtown Manhattan, P.C. as the Assignee of various Patients named in the within complaint
Represented By: William Cafaro, Sr
Represented By: Amit Kumar
Represented By: Matthew S. Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?