Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd. v. Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.
Defendant: Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation, Miramax, LLC, Miramax Film Corporation, Miramax Film NY, LLC, ERPFC Releasing, Inc., Does 1-20 and Miramax Film Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv09396
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Tom J. Ferber dated January 8, 2021 re: permission to file a motion to dismiss. Document filed by ERPFC Releasing, Inc., Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation..(Ferber, Tom)
January 5, 2021 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeremiah Reynolds dated January 5, 2021 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Reynolds, Jeremiah)
January 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/8/2021. Responses due by 3/1/2021 Replies due by 3/15/2021. (kv)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Conference ; denying #42 Letter Motion for Conference. Accordingly: 1. The parties' requests for a pre-motion conference are DENIED; 2. Miramax's request to file a motion to dismiss is GRANTED; 3. By February 8, 2021, Miramax shall file its motion to dismiss; 4. By March 1, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its opposition; and 5. By March 15, 2021, Miramax shall file its reply, if any. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/4/2021) (kv)
December 28, 2020 Filing 42 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #36 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Miramax's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John Gatti dated December 18, 2020. Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.'s Response Letter addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeremiah Reynolds dated December 28, 2020. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Reynolds, Jeremiah)
December 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: ERPFC Releasing, Inc. answer due 1/8/2021; Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation answer due 1/8/2021. (ks)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. By January 8, 2021, the Pressman Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/21/2020) (ks)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Katherine R. Pierucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ap)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Jeremiah T. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ap)
December 20, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Katherine R. Pierucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 20, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Jeremiah T. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23109742. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 18, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Katherine R. Pierucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Pierucci, Katie)
December 18, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Jeremiah T. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23109742. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Reynolds, Jeremiah)
December 18, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Miramax's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John Gatti dated December 18, 2020. Document filed by Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC..(Gatti, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Beth Cooperman on behalf of ERPFC Releasing, Inc., Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation..(Cooperman, Lauren)
December 18, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Tom J. Ferber dated December 18, 2020. Document filed by ERPFC Releasing, Inc., Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation..(Ferber, Tom)
December 18, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tom J. Ferber on behalf of ERPFC Releasing, Inc., Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation..(Ferber, Tom)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Lauren J. Fried to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ap)
December 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Lauren J. Fried to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23043390. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
December 15, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Lauren J. Fried to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23043390. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren J. Fried, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Fried, Lauren)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for John M. Gatti to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ap)
December 9, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for John M. Gatti to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22962227. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 9, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for John M. Gatti to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22962227. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John M. Gatti, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Gatti, John)
December 4, 2020 Filing 28 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Does 1-20, ERPFC Releasing, Inc., Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation, Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Miller, Simon)
December 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #27 MOTION for Katherine Renee Pierucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22873978. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar for this state.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
December 3, 2020 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Katherine Renee Pierucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22873978. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Pierucci, Katie) Modified on 12/4/2020 (bcu).
November 18, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. ERPFC Releasing, Inc. served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. Service was accepted by Edward Pressman, Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon)
November 18, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Miramax Film NY, LLC served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company (Registered Agent). Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon)
November 18, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Miramax, LLC served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management, Corporation Service Company (Registered Agent). Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon)
November 18, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Miramax Film Corp. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, CT Corporation (Registered Agent). Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon)
November 18, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. Service was accepted by Paula Litner, United Corporate Services, Inc. (Registered Agent). Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon)
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2020) (kv)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 11:20 a.m., on January 12, 2021, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Initial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 11:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2020) (kv)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2020) (kv)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Miller, Simon)
November 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Simon Joel Kasha Miller to RE-FILE re: Document No. #16 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct; the Date Filed field on the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (sj)
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Miller, Simon) Modified on 11/13/2020 (sj).
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Miller, Simon)
November 12, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Does 1-20 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Miller, Simon)
November 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Simon Joel Kasha Miller to RE-FILE Document No. #9 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not the official AO 121 form dated June 2016. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Miramax, LLC..(jgo)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Miramax Film NY, LLC..(jgo)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Miramax Film Corp...(jgo)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ERPFC Releasing, Inc...(jgo)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation..(jgo)
November 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Simon Joel Kasha Mille. re: Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add party Does 1-20. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
November 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Simon Joel Kasha Miller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation; Miramax, LLC; Miramax Film NY, LLC; Miramax Film Corporation; ERPFC Releasing, Inc.; Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Simon Joel Kasha Miller to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Miller, Simon) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jgo).
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miramax, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miramax Film NY, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miramax Film Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Miramax Film Corporation..(Miller, Simon)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ERPFC Releasing, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simon Joel Kasha Miller on behalf of Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Miller, Simon) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jgo).
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERPFC Releasing, Inc., Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation, Miramax Film Corporation, Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22517757)Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Miller, Simon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd. v. Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation
Represented By: Lauren Beth Cooperman
Represented By: Tom J. Ferber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miramax, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Jennifer Fried
Represented By: John Michael Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miramax Film Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miramax Film NY, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Jennifer Fried
Represented By: John Michael Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERPFC Releasing, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Beth Cooperman
Represented By: Tom J. Ferber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miramax Film Corp.
Represented By: Lauren Jennifer Fried
Represented By: John Michael Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.
Represented By: Simon Joel Kasha Miller
Represented By: Jeremiah T. Reynolds
Represented By: Katie Pierucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?