Pacelli v. Vane Line Bunkering, Inc.
Petitioner: Mr. Daniel Pacelli
Respondent: Vane Line Bunkering, Inc. and Vane Line Bunkering, Inc. doing business as Vane Brothers
Case Number: 1:2020cv09431
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration /Notice of Summary Judgment Motion Seeking to Vacate Arbitration Award. . Document filed by Vane Line Bunkering, Inc...(Forde, James)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #15 Proposed Stipulation and Order filed by Daniel Pacelli. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Vane Line Bunkering, Inc. answer due 1/8/2021.(Responses due by 1/8/2021, Replies due by 1/22/2021.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/8/2020) (nb)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Daniel Pacelli..(Bernstein, Scott)
December 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #11 Letter Motion for Conference. Petitioner's request for a pre-motion conference is DENIED without prejudice to renewing this request once Respondent appears in this matter. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/6/2020) (nb)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motion for Summary Judgment served on Vane Line Bunkering, Inc. on 11/16/2020. Document filed by Daniel Pacelli..(Bernstein, Scott)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award served on Vane Line Bunkering, Inc. on 11/16/2020. Document filed by Daniel Pacelli..(Bernstein, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Conference Submitted Pursuant to Rule 6.A of Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Martin P. Skolnick, Esq. dated 11/20/20. Document filed by Daniel Pacelli..(Skolnick, Martin)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vane Line Bunkering, Inc.. (sj)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vane Line Bunkering, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Daniel Pacelli..(Bernstein, Scott)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott Howard Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form dated June 2012. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Howard Bernstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Howard Bernstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Vane Line Bunkering, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vane Line Bunkering, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Daniel Pacelli..(Bernstein, Scott) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jgo).
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration /Notice of Summary Judgment Motion Seeking to Vacate Arbitration Award. /Rule 56.1 Statement in Support of Summary Judgment Motion. Document filed by Daniel Pacelli..(Bernstein, Scott)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Martin P. Skolnick, Esq. in Support re: #4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration /Notice of Summary Judgment Motion Seeking to Vacate Arbitration Award.. Document filed by Daniel Pacelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit Y, #25 Exhibit Z, #26 Exhibit AA, #27 Exhibit BB, #28 Exhibit CC, #29 Exhibit DD, #30 Exhibit EE, #31 Exhibit FF, #32 Exhibit GG, #33 Exhibit HH, #34 Exhibit II, #35 Exhibit JJ, #36 Exhibit KK, #37 Exhibit LL, #38 Exhibit MM, #39 Exhibit NN, #40 Exhibit OO, #41 Exhibit X).(Bernstein, Scott)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration /Notice of Summary Judgment Motion Seeking to Vacate Arbitration Award. . Document filed by Daniel Pacelli..(Bernstein, Scott)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration /Notice of Summary Judgment Motion Seeking to Vacate Arbitration Award. Document filed by Daniel Pacelli..(Bernstein, Scott)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin Phillip Skolnick on behalf of Daniel Pacelli..(Skolnick, Martin)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bernstein, Scott)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION TO Vacate ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22521239).Document filed by Daniel Pacelli..(Bernstein, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacelli v. Vane Line Bunkering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vane Line Bunkering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vane Line Bunkering, Inc. doing business as Vane Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Daniel Pacelli
Represented By: Martin Phillip Skolnick
Represented By: Scott Howard Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?