Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation v. Noroton Heights & Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation
Defendant: Noroton Heights & Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv09622
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Noroton Heights & Company, LLC.Document filed by Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Dec. 19, 2019 Letter of Intent, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - GMP Amendment, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Dec. 16, 2019 Email re: CBRE Materials, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - CBRE Report, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Feb. 27, 2020 Email re Balancing Payment, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Feb. 18, 2020 Email re Permits, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - Feb. 5, 2020 Email re Modifications to P&S, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - Mar. 13, 2020 Will-Serve DropBox, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - Mar. 9, 2020 BC Notice to Noroton, #11 Exhibit Ex. K - Mar. 26, 2020 Stop Work Order, #12 Exhibit Ex. L - Aug. 17, 2020 Demand).(Stocks, Remy)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 2/12/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/8/2020) (va)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE PARTIES' TIME TO FILE PLEADINGS: IT IS THEREFORE STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties, subject to the Court's approval, as follows: 1. Trez Capital will file its Complaint on or before December 16, 2020. 2. Noroton will file its Answer or otherwise move with respect to Trez Capital's Complaint on or before January 22, 2021. 3. This stipulation may be executed in counterparts via facsimile or e-mail, each of which shall be deemed an original and all of which shall constitute one Stipulation. IT IS SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #9 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint and Response Thereto addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Stephen B. Meister dated December 3, 2020, filed by Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation. Noroton Heights & Company, LLC answer due 1/22/2021.( Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/3/2020) (va)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint and Response Thereto addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Stephen B. Meister dated December 3, 2020. Document filed by Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation & Proposed Order).(Meister, Stephen)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Trez Capital Limited Partnership for Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation. Document filed by Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation..(Meister, Stephen)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Remy Joanna Stocks on behalf of Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation..(Stocks, Remy)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Bruce Meister on behalf of Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation..(Meister, Stephen)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Leonard Matthew Braman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $14,000,000; County code XX Out of U.S.;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yonatan Y Jacobs on behalf of Noroton Heights & Company, LLC..(Jacobs, Yonatan)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin M. Sher on behalf of Noroton Heights & Company, LLC..(Sher, Justin)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Noroton Heights Shopping Center, Inc. for Noroton Heights & Company, LLC. Document filed by Noroton Heights & Company, LLC..(Braman, Leonard)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Braman, Leonard)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 656118/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22601821).Document filed by Noroton Heights & Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons with Notice).(Braman, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation v. Noroton Heights & Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trez Capital (Florida) Corporation
Represented By: Remy Joanna Stocks
Represented By: Stephen Bruce Meister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noroton Heights & Company, LLC
Represented By: Leonard Matthew Braman
Represented By: Yonatan Y Jacobs
Represented By: Justin M. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?