Zhuo v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Meixia Zhuo
Defendant: Mark Hazuda, Acting Sec. of DHS Chad Wolf, Acting Director USCI Ken Cuccinelli, William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv09715
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/6/2021) (jca)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(Byars, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(Byars, Michael)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. William Barr served on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021; Ken Cuccinelli served on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021; Mark Hazuda served on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021; Chad Wolf served on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Meixia Zhuo..(Zheng, Taobo)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(pc)
November 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 19, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Taobo Zheng. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chad Wolf, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, William Barr, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Meixia Zhuo..(Zheng, Taobo)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zheng, Taobo)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22644753).Document filed by Meixia Zhuo..(Zheng, Taobo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhuo v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Sec. of DHS Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director USCI Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meixia Zhuo
Represented By: Taobo Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?