Walgreen Co. et al v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Plaintiff: H-E-B, L.P., Walgreen Co., Albertsons Companies, Inc. and The Kroger Co.
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc., Allergan, Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Glenmark Generics Inc., USA, Torrent Pharma Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY), Hetero Labs Ltd., Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd., AbbVie Inc., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Hetero Drugs Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV), Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Watson Laboratories (CT), Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Allergan USA, Inc. and ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv09793
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(jgo)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY)..(jgo)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY), re: #21 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #21 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd...(jgo)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., re: #21 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #3 Complaint,,, against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Actavis, Inc., Glenmark Generics Inc., USA, Allergan Sales, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV), Torrent Pharma Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY), Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Hetero USA Inc., Watson Laboratories (CT), Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Hetero Drugs Ltd., Allergan USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, AbbVie Inc., ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by All Defendants. Related document: #3 Complaint,,,.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 158 .(Perwin, Scott)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE SCHEDULE AND OTHER PROCEDURES: NOW THEREFORE, in order to promote efficiency in managing and litigating these actions and to coordinate the deadlines and procedures in these actions with those in the related case, In re Bystolic Antitrust Litigation, No. 1:20-cv-05735-LJL, the Parties stipulate and agree as follows: (As further set forth herein.) 7. Amended Complaints and Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by December 23, 2020. Defendants shall move in response to the amended complaints by February 8, 2021; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition(s) no later than 35 days after Defendants file any motion(s) in response to the complaints; Defendants shall file their replies in support of their motion(s), if any, no later than 28 days after Plaintiffs file any opposition(s); and oral argument, if any, on the motions to dismiss shall be on a date set by the Court. Plaintiffs may amend their complaints no later than 35 days following the filing of Defendants' motion(s) to dismiss pursuant to the Court's Individual Practice 3.B. IT IS SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2020. Motions due by 2/8/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 12/22/2020) (va)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(dnh)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #3 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05538-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 20-cv-5538. (jgo)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Eliot Perwin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Lauren Carol Ravkind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Ravkind, Lauren)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Anna T. Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22684234. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Neill, Anna)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Lauren Carol Ravkind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22684058. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Ravkind, Lauren) Modified on 11/20/2020 (vba).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by H-E-B, L.P...(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, Inc. for Albertsons Companies, Inc.. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc...(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Kroger Co...(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co.. Document filed by Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Scott Eliot Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22683496. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-08756-LJL. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-08754-LJL. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-07110-LJL. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-05735-LJL. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-05538-LJL. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co...(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against AbbVie Inc., Actavis, Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Glenmark Generics Inc., USA, Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Hetero Drugs Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero USA Inc., Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Watson Laboratories (CT), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY), Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co., Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P...(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perwin, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR COMPLAINT against AbbVie Inc., Actavis, Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Glenmark Generics Inc., USA, Glenmark Generics Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Hetero Drugs Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero USA Inc., Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Watson Laboratories (CT), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY), Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22682422)Document filed by The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co., Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P...(Perwin, Scott) Modified on 11/20/2020 (sj).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Scott Eliot Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22683496. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Anna T. Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22684234. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #14 MOTION for Lauren Carol Ravkind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22684058. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): NO CASE NUMBER LISTED ON ANY DOCUMENTS;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Lauren Carol Ravkind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walgreen Co. et al v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-E-B, L.P.
Represented By: Scott Eliot Perwin
Represented By: Lauren Carol Ravkind
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Scott Eliot Perwin
Represented By: Lauren Carol Ravkind
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Eliot Perwin
Represented By: Lauren Carol Ravkind
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Scott Eliot Perwin
Represented By: Lauren Carol Ravkind
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascend Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Generics Inc., USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerigen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alkem Laboratories Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories (CT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Generics Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?