Perez et al v. Third Avenue Food Corp., et al
Plaintiff: Amilcar Romeo Perez, Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel and Fidel Avila Perez
Defendant: Jaime a/k/a Jimmy Doe, Third Avenue Food Corp. d/b/a Tivoli Cafe d/b/a Tivoli Cafe doing business as d/b/a Tivoli Cafe, Gus Kassimis, Jaime Doe, Jimmy and Third Avenue Food Corp. doing business as d/b/a Tivoli Cafe
Case Number: 1:2020cv09832
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Third Avenue Food Corp. served on 12/2/2020, answer due 12/23/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(on behalf of others similarly situated); Fidel Avila Perez(individually); Amilcar Romeo Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Fidel Avila Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Amilcar Romeo Perez(individually); Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/25/20) (yv)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jaime Doe..(dnh)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gus Kassimis..(dnh)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Third Avenue Food Corp...(dnh)
November 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
November 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Third Avenue Food Corp. d/b/a Tivoli Cafe ; Jaime a/k/a Jimmy Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Scott Johnson on behalf of Fidel Avila Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fidel Avila Perez(individually), Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(individually), Amilcar Romeo Perez(individually), Amilcar Romeo Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Johnson, Kevin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jaime Doe a/k/a Jimmy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Fidel Avila Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fidel Avila Perez(individually), Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(individually), Amilcar Romeo Perez(individually), Amilcar Romeo Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gus Kassimis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Fidel Avila Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fidel Avila Perez(individually), Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(individually), Amilcar Romeo Perez(individually), Amilcar Romeo Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Third Avenue Food Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Fidel Avila Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fidel Avila Perez(individually), Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(individually), Amilcar Romeo Perez(individually), Amilcar Romeo Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jaime a/k/a Jimmy Doe, Gus Kassimis, Third Avenue Food Corp. d/b/a Tivoli Cafe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22703589)Document filed by Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fidel Avila Perez(individually), Amilcar Romeo Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fidel Avila Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Amilcar Romeo Perez(individually), Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Third Avenue Food Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime a/k/a Jimmy Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Avenue Food Corp. d/b/a Tivoli Cafe d/b/a Tivoli Cafe doing business as d/b/a Tivoli Cafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gus Kassimis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Avenue Food Corp. doing business as d/b/a Tivoli Cafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amilcar Romeo Perez
Represented By: Kevin Scott Johnson
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Eduardo Guarcax Chilel
Represented By: Kevin Scott Johnson
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Avila Perez
Represented By: Kevin Scott Johnson
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?