Roberts v. Ritch et al
Plaintiff: Brittany Roberts
Defendant: Robert Ritch and ROBERT RITCH MD LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv09861
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the attorneys for the parties herein that the Fourth Affirmative Defense-lack of in personal jurisdiction (paragraph 12 in Defendants' answer) and Fifth Affirmative Defense-insufficient service of process (paragraph 13 in Defendants' answer) are hereby withdrawn. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/20/2021) (jwh)
January 20, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Brittany Roberts..(Karlin, Stewart)
January 14, 2021 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/16/2021..(ah)
December 30, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert Ritch served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. Service was accepted by 'John' Saban, Doorman. Document filed by Brittany Roberts..(Kapitonova, Natalia)
December 30, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert Ritch MD LLC served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Clerk. Document filed by Brittany Roberts..(Kapitonova, Natalia)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/8/2021. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Ritch, Robert Ritch MD LLC..(Bythewood, David)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Ritch MD LLC..(dnh)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Ritch..(dnh)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Ritch, MD LLC, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Roberts..(Karlin, Stewart)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Robert Ritch, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Roberts..(Karlin, Stewart)
November 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stewart Lee Karlin to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons must be linked to an accepted pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
November 25, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stewart Lee Karlin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert Ritch MD LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
November 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stewart Lee Karlin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings. (sj)
November 25, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #5 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-22711064, paid on 11/23/2020. (sj)
November 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 25, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against ROBERT RITCH MD LLC, Robert Ritch. Document filed by Brittany Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Coworker Declaration, #2 Exhibit Declaration).(Karlin, Stewart)
November 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Stewart Lee Karlin to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 11/30/2020. (sj)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT RITCH MD LLC, Robert Ritch with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Brittany Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Declaration).(Karlin, Stewart) Modified on 11/24/2020 (sj).
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Ritch, MD LLC, re: Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Roberts..(Karlin, Stewart) Modified on 11/25/2020 (sj).
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Robert Ritch, re: Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Roberts..(Karlin, Stewart) Modified on 11/25/2020 (sj).
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Karlin, Stewart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Ritch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ritch
Represented By: David A. Bythewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT RITCH MD LLC
Represented By: David A. Bythewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Roberts
Represented By: Stewart Lee Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?