Morrell v. WW International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lee Morrell
Defendant: WW International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv09912
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. WW International, Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. Document filed by Lee Morrell..(Fraietta, Philip)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Frederick John Klorczyk on behalf of Lee Morrell. New Address: Bursor & Fisher, P.A., 888 Seventh Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10106, 646-837-7150..(Klorczyk, Frederick)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederick John Klorczyk on behalf of Lee Morrell..(Klorczyk, Frederick)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WW International, Inc...(dnh)
November 25, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 25, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
November 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WW International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lee Morrell..(Fraietta, Philip)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fraietta, Philip)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WW International, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22738258)Document filed by Lee Morrell..(Fraietta, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrell v. WW International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WW International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Morrell
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?