Fierro v. The City of New York, Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Fierro
Defendant: Unknown Ferguson, The City of New York, Department of Education, Tasha Ferguson and Ms. Ferguson
Case Number: 1:2020cv09966
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants the City of New York (the "City") and the New York City Department of Education (the "DOE")'s requests to extend the deadline to respond to the amended complaint, to adjourn the initial pretrial conference, and to extend the deadline to submit the initial pretrial conference materials, Dkt. No. 13, are granted. The deadline for Defendants the City and the DOE to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to March 22, 2021. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 4, 2021 is adjourned to April 14, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. The conference will take place by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Courts web page, for the dial-in number and access code and other relevant information. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of those rules. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan referenced in the Court's November 30, 2020 order, Dkt. No. 3, are due no later than April 7, 2021. Plaintiff is directed to serve this order on defendant Tasha Ferguson and to retain proof of service. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/14/2021) (ama)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Tasha Ferguson answer due 11/22/2021; The City of New York, Department of Education answer due 3/22/2021., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (ama)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Tasha Ferguson answer due 3/22/2021. (ama)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Abed Z. Bhuyan dated January 13, 2021. Document filed by The City of New York, Department of Education..(Bhuyan, Abed)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abed Z. Bhuyan on behalf of The City of New York, Department of Education..(Bhuyan, Abed)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City of New York, Department of Education..(pc)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tasha Ferguson..(pc)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tasha Ferguson, re: #7 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Fierro..(Marks, Matthew)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, Department of Education, re: #7 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Fierro..(Marks, Matthew)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Amended Complaint, against Tasha Ferguson, The City of New York, Department of Education with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Joseph Fierro. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint,..(Marks, Matthew)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Tasha Ferguson added. Party added pursuant to #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint.Document filed by Joseph Fierro. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint..(Marks, Matthew)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Matthew Ian Marks to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading.;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Matthew Ian Marks to RE-FILE re: Document No. #4 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Add Tasha Ferguson to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tasha Ferguson, re: #4 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Fierro..(Marks, Matthew)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, Department of Education, re: #4 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Fierro..(Marks, Matthew)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Ferguson, The City of New York, Department of Education with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Joseph Fierro. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Marks, Matthew) Modified on 12/18/2020 (pc).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/30/2020) (mro)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Matthew Ian Marks. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ms. Ferguson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marks, Matthew)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Ferguson, The City of New York, Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22752909)Document filed by Joseph Fierro..(Marks, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fierro v. The City of New York, Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York, Department of Education
Represented By: Abed Z. Bhuyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fierro
Represented By: Matthew Ian Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?