Garcia v. New York City Health And Hospital Corporation
Plaintiff: Felipa Garcia
Defendant: New York City Health And Hospital Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv09970
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting #10 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: OK to all. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/14/2020) (jwh)
December 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/12/2021. Responses due by 3/12/2021. Replies due by 4/2/2021. (jwh)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on consent of all parties addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Dylan Braverman dated December 11, 2020., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages obo Defendant's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b) addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Dylan Braverman dated December 11, 2020. Document filed by New York City Health And Hospital Corporation..(Braverman, Dylan)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Posin Jacobs on behalf of Felipa Garcia..(Jacobs, Benjamin)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Mitchell Rubin on behalf of Felipa Garcia..(Rubin, Todd)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/3/2020) (jwh)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Kenneth Faillace on behalf of New York City Health And Hospital Corporation..(Faillace, Charles)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Dylan Braverman dated December 2, 2020. Document filed by New York City Health And Hospital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal).(Braverman, Dylan)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan Alice Lawless on behalf of New York City Health And Hospital Corporation..(Lawless, Megan)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dylan C. Braverman on behalf of New York City Health And Hospital Corporation..(Braverman, Dylan)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Charles)
November 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Charles Kenneth Faillace. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All parties. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
November 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Charles Kenneth Faillace to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
November 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Charles Kenneth Faillace. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the County code has been modified to New York. (sj)
November 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 159046/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22754171).Document filed by New York City Health And Hospital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex.A - S&C, #3 Exhibit Ex.B - Notice of Claim, #4 Exhibit Ex.C - 50h Hearing Transcript of Claimant Felipa Garcia, #5 Exhibit Ex.D - HHS Letter).(Faillace, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. New York City Health And Hospital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Health And Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Charles Kenneth Faillace
Represented By: Megan Alice Lawless
Represented By: Dylan C. Braverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipa Garcia
Represented By: Benjamin Posin Jacobs
Represented By: Todd Mitchell Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?