White v. UMG Recordings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jordan White
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc. a Delaware Corporation, individually and doing business as Interscope Records, Jordan Carter and Does 1-10, inclusive
Counter Claimant: Jordan Timothy Jenks
Case Number: 1:2020cv09971
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Scott Alan Burroughs, Esq. dated March 3, 2023 re: Response to Defendants' Letter Dated February 17, 2023. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) - Lainson Declaration).(Burroughs, Scott)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 2/17/2023 re: Supplement to Rule 37 Application filed per directive of the Court. Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Movit, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying #167 Motion to Compel; granting #169 Motion to Seal. Additionally, the portions of Carters transcript submitted by Defendants contradict Plaintiff's assertions made in ECF 167. Plaintiff's motion to compel a second deposition and his request for sanctions is accordingly DENIED. The Court further finds that Plaintiff's motion was not substantially justified under Rule 37(a)(5). By February 17, 2023, Defendants may supplement their pending motion for costs (ECF 162) to include their expenses incurred in responding to ECF 167. Plaintiff's response is due March 3, 2023. There shall be no replies. Defendants' letter motion to file certain portions of ECF 168 under seal is GRANTED for the reasons stated in that motion. (ECF 169). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF Nos. 167 and 169. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 2/1/2023) (ks)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 01/30/2023 re: #167 LETTER MOTION to Compel Jordan Carter to appear for Second Deposition Session addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Scott Alan Burroughs, Esq. dated January 25, 2023. . Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc., Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - SEAL - HIGHLIGHTED - Carter Final Transcript)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #169 .(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 169 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 01/30/2023. Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 01/30/2023 re: #167 LETTER MOTION to Compel Jordan Carter to appear for Second Deposition Session addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Scott Alan Burroughs, Esq. dated January 25, 2023. . Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - REDACTED CARTER Final Transcript).(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 LETTER MOTION to Compel Jordan Carter to appear for Second Deposition Session addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Scott Alan Burroughs, Esq. dated January 25, 2023. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (1)).(Burroughs, Scott)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #162 MOTION for Attorney Fees & Reasonable Expenses Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5). . Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #162 MOTION for Attorney Fees & Reasonable Expenses Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5). . Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Counsel).(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 164 DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Movit in Support re: #162 MOTION for Attorney Fees & Reasonable Expenses Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5).. Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MSK Highlighted Invoice).(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #162 MOTION for Attorney Fees & Reasonable Expenses Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5). . Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION for Attorney Fees & Reasonable Expenses Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5). Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from O. Williams Igbokwe, Esq. dated 12/31/2022 re: Subpoena Withdrawal. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service).(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ***SELECTED PARTIES***JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 12/23/2022 re: Status Report. Document filed by Jordan White, Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #157 .(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 12/23/2022 re: Status Report. Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPINION & ORDER re: #141 LETTER MOTION for Conference, addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Elaine Nguyen dated December 9, 2022, filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to quash the Subpoenas is GRANTED. To the extent that they have not already done so, Plaintiff's attorneys are directed to withdraw the Subpoenas FORTHWITH and to serve a copy of this Order on all of the recipients of the Subpoenas (namely, Larsen, Jenks, Sherrod, SoundCloud, and Twitter), and file proof of such service on the docket no later than December 31, 2022. If Defendants seek an apportionment of reasonable expenses under Rule 37(a)(5) for responding to and quashing the Subpoenas, they shall file their consolidated motion and opposition on the schedule set forth in ECF 157: January 9, 2023 for the motion, January 17, 2023 for any opposition, and January 23, 2023 for any reply. The submissions are limited to 2000 words, exclusive of exhibits and counsel's certification of their word count. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF 141. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 1/9/2023. Responses due by 1/17/2023. Replies due by 1/23/2023.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/21/2022) (va)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER denying #142 Motion to Compel; granting #143 Motion to Seal; granting #153 Letter Motion to Seal. Defendants' motion to strike is DENIED as moot because the motion to compel was resolved on its merits, or lack thereof. If they have not already done so, Defendants are directed to produce the email addresses connected to Carter's identified social media accounts no later than December 23, 2022. The parties are directed to file a letter on the docket no later than December 23, 2022 informing the Court of the date scheduled for Carter's deposition. The letter may redact the date so that it is visible to Court personnel and the parties only. Carters deposition is limited to 2.5 hours of testimony and must be completed before January 31, 2023. All other discovery in this case is complete, and all other requests in Plaintiff's motion to compel are DENIED. The parties' motions to seal (ECF 143, 153) are GRANTED for the reasons stated in those motions. Finally, the Court is concerned that Plaintiff's motion to compel was not substantially justified, and that counsel did not meet and confer in good faith as required by the federal rules and as directed at the October 20 conference. Accordingly, if Defendants seek an apportionment of reasonable expenses under Rule 37(a)(5) for opposing the motion to compel, they shall file their motion no later than January 9, 2023. Plaintiff's opposition is due January 17, 2023. Defendants may reply no later than January 23, 2023. Untimely filings will not be considered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF Nos. 142, 143, and 153. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/19/22) (yv)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/9/2023. Responses due by 1/17/2023. Replies due by 1/23/2023. (yv)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 12/19/2022 re: response to Plaintiff's letter dated 12/16/2022. Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Scott Alan Burroughs, Esq. dated December 16, 2022 re: Opposition to Motion to Quash. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) - Email Correspondence, #2 Exhibit (B) Initial Disclosures).(Burroughs, Scott)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated December 16, 2022 re: #142 FIRST MOTION to Compel Universal Music Group, Inc., and Jordan Carter p/k/a "Playboi Carti" to Produce Outstanding Discovery Documents; and to Appear for Depositions on a date certain. . Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc., Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit F)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #153 .(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 LETTER MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants Letter in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated December 16, 2022. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated December 16, 2022 re: #142 FIRST MOTION to Compel Universal Music Group, Inc., and Jordan Carter p/k/a "Playboi Carti" to Produce Outstanding Discovery Documents; and to Appear for Depositions on a date certain. . Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10-26-22 Letter from Burroughs to Movit, #2 Exhibit B - 11-3-22 Letter from Movit to Burroughs, Igbokwe and Santiago (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - 11-16-22 Letter from Igbokwe to Movit, #4 Exhibit D - 11-18-22 Letter from Movit to Burroughs, Igbokwe and Santiago, #5 Exhibit E - 12-8-22 Email from Igbokwe to Movit, #6 Exhibit F - 12-8-22 Email from Movit to Igbokwe (Redacted)).(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying #150 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #150 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #142 FIRST MOTION to Compel Universal Music Group, Inc., and Jordan Carter p/k/a "Playboi Carti" to Produce Outstanding Discovery Documents; and to Appear for. The Court has reviewed ECF 150. Defendants' request to extend their deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (ECF 142) is DENIED. Defendants are to specifically address the following issues in their opposition: and further set forth in this Order. The Court will resolve Defendants' motion to strike in conjunction with Plaintiff's motion to compel, and no further arguments should be made regarding the motion to strike. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF 150. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/15/2022) (rro)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #142 FIRST MOTION to Compel Universal Music Group, Inc., and Jordan Carter p/k/a "Playboi Carti" to Produce Outstanding Discovery Documents; and to Appear for Depositions on a date certain. addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 12/14/2022. Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of O. Williams Igbokwe, Esq. in Support re: #143 MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Letter in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 2 - Messages of Erin Larsen, UMG VP, and Bermudez, #3 Exhibit 7 - Content Protection Directive May 11, 2018, #4 Exhibit 9 - Training Materials)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #143 .(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from O. Williams Igbokwe, Esq. dated 12/12/2022 re: Defendants' Request to Strike Motion to Compel. Document filed by Jordan White..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 12/12/2022 re: Plaintiff's Filing of a Motion in Contravention of the Court's Order. Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #144 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
December 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of O. Williams Igbokwe, Esq. in Support re: #142 FIRST MOTION to Compel Universal Music Group, Inc., and Jordan Carter p/k/a "Playboi Carti" to Produce Outstanding Discovery Documents; and to Appear for Depositions on a date certain.. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - Content Protection Directive May 11, 2018, #2 Exhibit 9 - Training Materials)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #142 .(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
December 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of O. Williams Igbokwe, Esq. in Support re: #143 MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Jordan White, Jordan Timothy Jenks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter in Support of Motion)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #143 .(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
December 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jordan White. Related Document Number: #143 ..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION to Seal . Document filed by Jordan White..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
December 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 FIRST MOTION to Compel Universal Music Group, Inc., and Jordan Carter p/k/a "Playboi Carti" to Produce Outstanding Discovery Documents; and to Appear for Depositions on a date certain. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Meet and Confer Letter, #2 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Deposition 10/2021, #3 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Deposition 9/2021, #4 Exhibit 5 - Oi! YouTube Video, #5 Exhibit 6 - Album "Die Lit" Release Date, #6 Exhibit 8 - Olumhense Dep., #7 Exhibit 10 - A$AP ILLZ SoundCloud, #8 Exhibit 11 - FADER Article).(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Elaine Nguyen dated December 9, 2022. Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 5-31-22 Olumhense Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Carter Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Twitter, Soundcloud, Larsen, Sherrod Duces Tecums, #4 Exhibit D - Subpoena to Jenks, #5 Exhibit E - 12.04.22 - Email from Igbokwe with Subpoenas ad testificandum, #6 Exhibit F - 12.02.22 - Email from Igbokwe, #7 Exhibit G - 12.08.22 - Email from Igbokwe, #8 Exhibit H - Excerpts of 12-7-22 - Bermudez Rough Transcript, #9 Exhibit I - Twitter Subpoenas).(Nguyen, Elaine)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated December 9, 2022 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE Subpoena Duces Tecum Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Subpoena).(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 10/20/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 10/20/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/13/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly) Modified on 11/22/2022 (js).
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE Subpoena Duces Tecum Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Subpoenas).(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER, The parties shall proceed as follows: Plaintiff shall meet and confer with Defendants to clarify remaining outstanding paper discovery, and the parties shall work together to produce that discovery. If the parties are unable to agree on the discovery to be produced, Plaintiff shall move to compel the documents at issue by December 9, 2022. Plaintiff shall specifically identify the requests at issue that are not duplicative and tie the information sought to the remaining claims in the matter. Defendants' opposition, if any, is due December 16, 2022. The parties' papers shall take the form of letter briefs. The parties shall submit a joint letter on the status of the above issues by December 9, 2022. The fact discovery deadline is extended to December 16, 2022. No expert discovery shall take place absent further order from the Court. SO ORDERED. ( Fact Discovery due by 12/16/2022., Motions due by 12/9/2022., Responses due by 12/16/2022) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/21/22) (yv) Modified on 11/22/2022 (yv).
November 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated November 20, 2022 re: correcting error in prior letter re: Mr. Carter's available deposition date. Document filed by Jordan Carter..(Movit, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from William Igbokwe dated 11/18/2022 re: Status Update Requested by the Court. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Jenks Deposition Correspondence, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Deposition, Jordan Carter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Follow-up Letter).(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STATUS REPORT. Letter to Judge Ona Wang Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts of 5-31-22 Olumhense Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jordan Carter., #3 Exhibit Subpoena (duces tecum) to Christopher Bermudez - with Appendix A, #4 Exhibit Subpoena (ad testificandum) to Christopher Bermudez, #5 Exhibit 11.18.22 - Movit to Counsel for White Letter - Response to 11-16 Letter, #6 Exhibit White Subpoenas to Twitter, #7 Exhibit 11.18.22 - Email Exchange Between Counsel).(Movit, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE Subpoena Duces Tecum Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Subpoenas).(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #129 Letter filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file a joint status letter by November 18, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/14/2022) (rro)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 11/10/2022 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Status Conference held on 10/20/2022. (Quinn, Diane)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report re: Outstanding Discovery and Case Agenda Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 05.31.22 Olumhense Day 2 Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Cover Email and Supoenas to Christopher Bermudez).(Movit, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ANSWER to #123 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ANSWER to #123 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Jordan Carter..(Movit, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: The Court resolved the discovery disputes referenced in ECF Nos. 56 and 61 at the November 30, 2021 in-person status conference. (See ECF 67 at 29:24-30:4, 30:15-31:15). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF Nos. 56 and 61. SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: #56 LETTER MOTION for Discovery. addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit and O. William Igbokwe dated 11/09/2021. filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks, Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc., #61 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery. addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit and Scott A. Burroughs dated 11/09/2021 filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks, Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 9/16/2022) (ama)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Court's August 16, 2022 Order, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Jordan Timothy Jenks are DISMISSED. See ECF No. 117 at 9-10. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendant Jenks as a defendant in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/25/2022) (kv) Modified on 8/25/2022 (ate).
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #30 Amended Complaint against Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jordan White. Related document: #30 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Album cover screen capture from The FADER, #2 Exhibit Text Exchange between Bermudez and Defendant JENKS, #3 Exhibit The Die Lit album cover (left) and the Oi! cover (right), #4 Exhibit First Screenshot of a Twitter post by Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit Second Screenshot of a Twitter post by Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit Third Screenshot of a Twitter post by Plaintiff).(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Onyuwoma Williams Igbokwe to RE-FILE re: Document No. #121 Second Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Second Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #119 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court has reviewed ECF Nos. 119 and 120. Defendants' answer (or other response) to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is due September 23, 2022. The deadline to complete fact discovery is extended to October 20, 2022. The Court shall hold an in-person status conference in this matter on Thursday, October 20, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties shall file a joint agenda one week in advance of the conference, i.e., by October 13, 2022. The agenda should specify what discovery remains outstanding, if any, and what steps the parties have taken to resolve any discovery issues. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF 119. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 8/23/2022) (rro)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #30 Amended Complaint against Jordan Carter, Does, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jordan White. Related document: #30 Amended Complaint..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma) Modified on 8/24/2022 (vf).
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Jordan Timothy Jenks answer due 9/23/2022.( Fact Discovery due by 10/20/2022.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Status Conference set for 10/20/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (rro)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 08/22/2022 re: Opposition to the letter from Plaintiffs counsel (ECF No. 119). Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Chain with Opposing Counsel).(Movit, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 FOURTH LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to conduct discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Carlos M. Santiago, Jr. dated August 22, 2022. Document filed by Jordan White..(Santiago, Carlos)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying as moot #105 Motion for Entry of Default. Because Plaintiff has filed a response to Defendant Jenks' counterclaim, Jenks' motion for entry of a default judgment is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 105. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/19/2022) (tro)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #80 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's motion to file a second amended complaint is GRANTED. By August 23, 2022, Plaintiff shall file his proposed second amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 80. Should Plaintiff file his proposed second amended complaint, Plaintiff's claim against Jenks is DISMISSED, and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Jordan Timothy Jenks as a defendant in this action. Should Plaintiff not file his proposed second amended complaint, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Jordan Carter and UMG Recordings, Inc. as defendants in this action. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/16/2022) (ate)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2022. (ate)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: The Court has reviewed ECF 115. Discovery is extended for the sole purpose of completing the outstanding discovery discussed in ECF 115. The deadline to complete that discovery is August 29, 2022. By September 30, 2022, the parties shall file a post-discovery joint status letter informing the Court whether they intend to move for summary judgment or proceed to trial. If the parties intend to move for summary judgment, they are directed to meet and confer and submit, along with the joint letter, a proposed joint briefing schedule for their summary judgment motion(s). SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 8/29/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 8/5/2022) (jca)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from William Igbokwe dated 07/29/2022 re: Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Document filed by Jordan White..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #113 Letter filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. No further extensions absent good cause shown. ( Discovery due by 7/29/2022., Fact Discovery due by 6/14/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 6/6/2022) (rro)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey Movit dated 6/3/2022 re: Status Report. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks..(Movit, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #111 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application GRANTED. The fact discovery deadline is extended to June 14, 2022. The parties are directed to submit a joint status letter by June 3, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 4/29/2022) (rro)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 6/14/2022. (rro)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Joint Status Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated March 31, 2022. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks..(Movit, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: The case management conference scheduled for March 9, 2022, is ADJOURNED sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/8/2022) (kv)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #108 Letter filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall proceed with the deposition of defendant Jenks. Discovery is extended to May 13, 2022. The parties shall submit another joint status letter by March 31, 2022. ( Discovery due by 5/13/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/3/2022) (ate)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 02/18/2022 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks..(Movit, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ANSWER to #99 Counterclaim. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey Movit in Support re: #105 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Jordan White (Request for Certificate of Default from the Clerk of Court).. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Certificate of Default).(Movit, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Jordan White (Request for Certificate of Default from the Clerk of Court). Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks..(Movit, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #80 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Jordan White..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER. The parties shall file another joint discovery status letter by February 18, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (rlf)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/19/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/19/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/25/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 02/04/2022 re: Joint Letter Re: Status Report. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks..(Movit, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AMENDED ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Jordan White. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks..(Movit, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER re: #91 Letter, filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks. The Courtt has reviewed the parties letters at ECF Nos. 91 and 92. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)," [a] party may amend its pleading once as a matter of course within 21 days after serving it." Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) (emphasis added). Because Defendant Jenks requested leave to file his amended answer and counterclaim within 21 days of filing his original answer, see ECF Nos. 76 and 91, Defendant Jenks may file an amended answer and counterclaim. See Med. Soc 'y of New York v. UnitedHealth Grp. Inc., No. 16 Civ. 5265, 2018 WL 11220401, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. May 11, 2018). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/3/2022) (kv)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/19/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/19/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #80 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks..(Movit, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Movit in Opposition re: #80 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Movit Declaration - Redline of FAC and SAC, #2 Exhibit B to Movit Declaration - UMG0000001-3, #3 Exhibit C to Movit Declaration - RIAA0000007-10, #4 Exhibit D to Movit Declaration - Copyright Registration).(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Carlos M. Santiago, Jr. dated January 31, 2022 re: Response to Defendant's Letter Docket Entry 91. Document filed by Jordan White..(Santiago, Carlos)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Pursuant to the instructions given at the January 19, 2022 conference, the parties shall file a joint status letter on February 4, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (rlf)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 1/24/22 re: Request for Clarification that Jenks May Amend Answer as of Right, or Alternatively for a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Answer and Counterclaim).(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Status Conference held on 1/19/2022. (Quinn, Diane)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #88 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #88 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 1/18/2022. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 2/1/2022. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/19/2022) (ate)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Today's 3:45 p.m. status conference is converted to a telephonic conference. The dial in information is (866) 390-1828, access code 1582687. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (rlf)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 1/18/2022. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks..(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying #83 Motion to Seal. Accordingly, Plaintiff's request to seal Exhibit A is DENIED. By February 1, 2022, Plaintiff shall move the Court for an order to seal or redact Exhibit A in accordance with Rule IV.A. If Plaintiff has not done so by that date, the Clerk of Court shall be directed to unseal the document. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 83. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/18/2022) (jca)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Scott Burroughs dated January 18, 2022 re: Request to Attend Conference Telephonically. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/1/2022. (jca)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Pre-Settlement Conference held on 1/13/2022. (Quinn, Diane)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** BRIEF re: #83 MOTION to Seal . (Exhibit A to Burroughs Declaration). Document filed by Jordan White, Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #83 .(Burroughs, Scott)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DECLARATION of Scott Alan Burroughs in Support re: #83 MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Document).(Burroughs, Scott)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Seal . Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Burroughs, Scott)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECLARATION of Scott Alan Burroughs in Support re: #80 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed SAC).(Burroughs, Scott)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #80 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Burroughs, Scott)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Scott Alan Burroughs, Esq. dated January 7, 2022 re: Response to Defendants Letter Dated January 3, 2022. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference in this matter on Wednesday, January 19, 2022 at 3:45 p.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/6/2022) (rro)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a PreSettlement Conference Scheduling Call on Thursday, January 13, 2022 at 3:30 p.m. The dial in information is (866) 3901828, access code 1582687. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/6/2022) Telephone Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (ks)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks..(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated January 3, 2022 re: Decision and Order dated December 21, 2021 (ECF Doc. No. 71). Document filed by Jordan Carter, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Elaine Nguyen dated December 28, 2021 re: Status Report. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Status Letter to Magistrate Judge Ona Wang, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Status Letter to Magistrate Judge Ona Wang).(Nguyen, Elaine)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #72 Letter filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks. ENDORSEMENT: All deadlines in the scheduling order, ECF No. 45, remain in effect unless modified by Judge Wang or this Court. The case management conference scheduled for January 4, 2022, is ADJOURNED to March 9, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. ( Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/27/2021) (kv)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Elaine Nguyen dated December 23, 2021 re: Seeking Clarification of Justice Torres' Order. Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks..(Nguyen, Elaine)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #40 Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Moving Defendants' request to dismiss the amended complaint with prejudice is DENIED. For the foregoing reasons, Moving Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's claims against Carter and UMG and DENIED as to Jenks. By January 11, 2022, Plaintiff shall file any request for leave to further amend the complaint. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/21/2021) (kv)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STATUS REPORT. Status Letter Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Am. Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Defense Email, #3 Exhibit C - Defense Original Joint Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff Counsel's Email, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Status Report).(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated December 17, 2021 re: Status Letter with Date Proposals Pursuant to ECF Doc. No. 66.. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Status Conference proceeding held on 11/30/2021 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(jca)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Status Conference held on 11/30/2021 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2022.(jca)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the directions given at the November 30, 2021 conference, the parties shall submit a joint status letter on December 17, 2021. The letter shall address the status of discovery, propose dates for a Pre-Settlement Conference Scheduling Call in early January 2022, and propose dates for an in-person status conference the week of January 17, 2022. Fact discovery is extended to February 18, 2022. The parties shall adhere to all other rulings made on the record at the November 30, 2021 conference. Fact Discovery due by 2/18/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/1/2021) (rro)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Status Conference held on 11/30/2021. (Quinn, Diane)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Scott Alan Burroughs dated November 29, 2021 re: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Proposed Agenda For Court Conference. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 11/26/21 re: Proposed Agenda for Court Conference. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECLARATION of JORDAN CARTER in Support re: #61 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit and Scott A. Burroughs dated 11/09/2021.. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DECLARATION of OSAZE OLUMHENSE in Support re: #61 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit and Scott A. Burroughs dated 11/09/2021.. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit and Scott A. Burroughs dated 11/09/2021. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference in this matter on Tuesday, November 30, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 20D. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/18/2021) (rro)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Motions referred to Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/10/2021) (kv)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/10/2021) (kv)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit and O. William Igbokwe dated 11/09/2021. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Olumhense Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Carter Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Document Demands, #4 Exhibit D - White's Reponses to Defs Document Demands, #5 Exhibit E - Defendants' Interrogatories to White, #6 Exhibit F - White's Responses to Defs Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit G - White's Supplementa Discovery Responses, #8 Exhibit H - White's Bates Production).(Movit, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/23/2021 (kj). Modified on 11/23/2021 (lb).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #61 Letter Motion) -LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit and Scott A. Burroughs dated 11/09/2021. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Olumhense Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Carter Declaration).(Movit, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/23/2021 (kj). Modified on 11/23/2021 (lb). Modified on 11/29/2021 (db). As per ECF Error Email notification received on 11/29/21 @ 11:40am).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Accordingly, by November 12, 2021, the parties shall file a revised proposed protective order that specifies (1) that "Any party seeking to file redacted or entire documents under seal must obtain prior Court approval in accordance with Rule IV.A of this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. The parties shall meet and confer in an effort to minimize the redaction or sealing request prior to submitting their request to the Court," and (2) that the Court will retain jurisdiction over enforcement of the protective order until the end of this litigation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/5/2021) (jca)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 10/15/2021 re: the parties do not seek a reference to ADR. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: granting #49 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. Fact discovery shall be completed by December 16, 2021. Expert discovery shall be completed by February 7, 2022. The case management conference set for December 1, 2021, is ADJOURNED to January 4, 2022, at 10 20 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by December 28, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/13/2021) (ama)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Expert Discovery due by 2/7/2022., Fact Discovery due by 12/16/2021.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 10:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (ama)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 10/8/21 re: Opposition to Plaintiff's Letter Motion Requesting Extension. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Fact and Expert Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Scott Alan Burroughs dated October 8, 2021. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Laura Maria Zaharia on behalf of Jordan White. New Address: Doniger/Burroughs, PC, 247 Water Street, First Floor, New York, NY, United States 10038, 3105901820..(Zaharia, Laura)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Scott Alan Burroughs on behalf of Jordan White. New Address: Doniger/Burroughs, PC, 247 Water Street, First Floor, New York, NY, United States 10038, 3105901820..(Burroughs, Scott)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Maria Zaharia on behalf of Jordan White..(Zaharia, Laura)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan (the "Plan") is submitted by the parties in accordance with Rule 26(f)(3), Fed. R. Civ. P. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 11/16/2021. All Fact Discovery due by 11/16/2021. All Expert Discovery due by 1/7/2022. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is : 2-3 days (defendants' position); 4-5 (plaintiff's position). By October 15, 2021, the parties shall submit a joint letter indicating their positions on whether they wish to be referred to an alternative dispute resolution mechanism and, if so, which mechanism. The next Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/20/2021) (ama)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #38 Letter Motion to Stay re: #38 MOTION to Stay Discovery.. Accordingly, Defendants' motion to stay discovery is DENIED. By July 19, 2021, the parties shall submit a revised proposed case management plan and discovery schedule. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 38. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/12/2021) (kv)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc.. Responses due by 5/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law ISO Motion to Dismiss).(Movit, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re: #38 MOTION to Stay Discovery. . Document filed by Jordan White..(Santiago, Carlos)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Discovery. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law ISO Motion to Stay Discovery).(Movit, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #32 Letter Motion to Stay re: #32 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 03/10/2021., #36 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 04/02/2021. ; granting in part and denying in part #36 Letter Motion to Stay re: #32 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 03/10/2021., #36 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 04/02/2021. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. The Court REJECTS the parties' stipulation to stay discovery pending the resolution of the motion to dismiss. By April 9, 2021, Defendants may file their motion to stay discovery. By April 16, 2021, Plaintiff shall file his opposition, if any. By April 23, 2021, Defendants shall filed their reply, if any. If Defendants choose not to file a motion to stay, the deadlines in the case management plan shall take effect. Plaintiff shall file his opposition to the motion to dismiss by May 25, 2021. By June 8, 2021, Defendants shall file their reply, if any. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/5/2021) (kv)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/9/2021. Responses due by 5/25/2021 Replies due by 6/8/2021. (kv)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 04/02/2021. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elaine Nguyen on behalf of Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Nguyen, Elaine)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER with respect to #32 Letter Motion to Stay re: #32 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 03/10/2021. Accordingly, 1. Discovery is temporarily STAYED pending the Court's resolution of Defendants' proposed motion to stay discovery; 2. By April 6, 2021, Defendants shall file their motion to stay discovery; 3. By April 13, 2021, Plaintiff shall file his opposition; and 4. By April 20, 2021, Defendants shall file their reply, if any. Separately, 5. By April 27, 2021, Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss; 6. By May 18, 2021, Plaintiff shall file his opposition; and 7. By June 1, 2021, Defendants shall file their reply, if any. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/23/2021) (kv) Modified on 3/23/2021 (kv).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Defendants submit these dates without prejudice to their anticipated motion to stay discovery, as discussed in their pre-motion letter to the Court. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 4-5 days. Deposition due by 7/30/2021. Fact Discovery due by 7/30/2021. Expert Discovery due by 9/17/2021. Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/23/2021) (kv)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/27/2021. Responses due by 5/18/2021 Replies due by 6/1/2021. (kv)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/23/2021. (if)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 03/10/2021. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 03.10.2021 - Exh A to Pre Motion Letter.FAC).(Movit, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/23/2021 (kv).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey M. Movit to RE-FILE Document #27 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 03-10-2021. Use the event type Stay found under the event list Motions. (ldi)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Scott Alan Burroughs dated 3/17/2021 re: #27 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 03-10-2021. . Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Jordan Carter, Does, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jordan White. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Burroughs, Scott)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 03/17/2021 re: Joint Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 03-10-2021. Document filed by Jordan Carter, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Movit, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/22/2021 (ldi).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The conference scheduled for March 4, 2021, is ADJOURNED to March 23, 2021, at 10:20 a.m. By March 17, 2021, the parties shall submit an updated joint letter and proposed case management plan. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/23/2021 at 10:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/3/2021) (kv)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #24 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. The parties' request to adjourn the conference scheduled for March 4, 2021 is DENIED. By March 31, 2021, Defendant Jenks shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/26/2021) (kv)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Jordan Timothy Jenks answer due 3/31/2021. (kv)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Scott Alan Burroughs dated 2/25/2021. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. GRANTED. By March 22, 2021, Defendant Carter shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. No other deadlines or hearings shall be affected by this order. SO ORDERED. Jordan Carter answer due 3/22/2021 (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/17/2021) (kv)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated 02/16/2021. Document filed by Jordan Carter..(Movit, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jordan Timothy Jenks served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. Service was accepted by Casy (Doe) - Co-Resident and Person of Suitable Age Authorized to Accept Service. Service was made by mail after substituted service was executed. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jordan Carter served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. Service was accepted by Kimberly Carter - Mother and Co- Occupant Authorized to Accept Service. Service was made by mail after substituted service was executed. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey M. Movit on behalf of UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #15 Letter filed by UMG Recordings, Inc. MEMO ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. By March 10, 2021, Defendant UMG shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. No other deadlines shall be affected by this order. SO ORDERED., UMG Recordings, Inc. answer due 3/10/2021. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/8/2021) (nb)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey M. Movit dated February 5, 2021 re: Extension Request. Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Movit, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Onyuwoma Williams Igbokwe on behalf of Jordan White..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The conference scheduled for February 1, 2021, is ADJOURNED to March 4, 2021, at 11:20 a.m. By February 25, 2021, parties shall submit their joint letter and case management plan. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 11:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/22/2021) (kv)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Scott Alan Burroughs dated 1/21/2021. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. By February 8, 2021, Defendant UMG shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/5/2021) (ks)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: UMG Recordings, Inc. answer due 2/8/2021. (ks)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Nicholas J. Tardif dated 01/04/2021. Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Tardif, Nicholas)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. UMG Recordings, Inc. served on 12/17/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez, CT Corp Specialist. Document filed by Jordan White. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit affidavit of service).(Santiago, Carlos)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carlos Manuel Santiago, Jr on behalf of Jordan White..(Santiago, Carlos)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive dete1mination of eve1y action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/1/2020) (jca)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by January 25, 2021, email a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by January 25, 2021, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/1/2020) (jca)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICESINCLUDING THE COURT'S EMERGENCY RULES AND PRACTICES IN LIGHT OF COVID-19TO ALL PARTIES. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/1/2020) (jca)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jordan Carter, Does, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (sj)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Scott Alan Burroughs to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UMG RECORDINGS, INC., a Delaware Corporation, individually and Doing business as INTERSCOPE RECORDS; JORDAN TIMOTHY JENKS, p/k/a PIERRE BOURNE, an individual; JORDAN CARTER, p/k/a PLAYBOI CARTI, an individual; and DOES 1-10, inclusive, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burroughs, Scott)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jordan Carter, Does, Jordan Timothy Jenks, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22754210)Document filed by Jordan White..(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. UMG Recordings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc. a Delaware Corporation, individually and doing business as Interscope Records
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Tardif
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Movit
Represented By: Elaine Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Movit
Represented By: Elaine Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan White
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Represented By: Carlos Manuel Santiago, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Maria Zaharia
Represented By: Onyuwoma Williams Igbokwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jordan Timothy Jenks
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Movit
Represented By: Elaine Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?