Butler v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: WILLIE M BUTLER and Willie M. Butler
Defendant: Barbara Lynch, Greenburgh Health Center Inc., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Glenn Davis, United States Attorney General, MD Glenn Davis and RNP Barbara Lynch
Case Number: 1:2020cv10044
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: This case has been assigned to the undersigned for all purposes. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Counsel for all parties are hereby ORDERED to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on March 16, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the conference regarding settlement and each of the other subjects to be considered at the IPTC. No later than seven days prior to the IPTC, it is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/16/2020) (ama)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glenn Davis, Greenburgh Health Center Inc., Barbara Lynch, United States Attorney General, United States of America..(gp)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Reopen Case . Document filed by Willie M. Butler. Return Date set for 12/15/2020 at 02:00 PM..(Eddy, Deborah)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GREENBURGH HEALTH CENTER, BARBARA LYNCH, RNP, GLENN DAVIS, MD, and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Willie M. Butler..(Eddy, Deborah)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GREENBURGH HEALTH CENTER, BARBARA LYNCH, RNP, GLENN DAVIS, MD and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by WILLIE M BUTLER..(Eddy, Deborah) Modified on 12/15/2020 (gp).
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eddy, Deborah)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against GREENBURGH HEALTH CENTER, BARBARA LYNCH, RNP, GLENN DAVIS, MD and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Document filed by WILLIE M BUTLER..(Eddy, Deborah)
December 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
December 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Deborah D Eddy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Willie M. Butler, Glenn Davis, Barbara Lynch, United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (gp)
December 15, 2020 Transmission to Case Assignment Clerk. Transmitted re: #2 Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order,,,,, to the Case Assignment Clerk for preparation of notice of case assignment/reassignment..(gp)
December 15, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION to Reopen Case . Document filed by WILLIE M BUTLER. Return Date set for 12/14/2020 at 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons).(Eddy, Deborah) Modified on 12/15/2020 (gp).
December 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Deborah D Eddy to RE-FILE Document #3 Notice of Application to Reopen Case. The deficiency was not cured, refile the Complaint and the correct Notice of Application to Reopen Case. (gp)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF APPLICATION TO REOPEN CASE: Pursuant to Amended Standing Order (15-MC-131):. The deficiency(ies) has been cured and the party(ies) seek to reopen the civil case. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 COMPLAINT).(Eddy, Deborah) Modified on 12/10/2020 (gp).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 2/8/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (jgo)
December 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Deborah D Eddy. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
December 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Deborah D Eddy to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the filing must only include the pleading; remove the first two pages. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 12/7/2020. (jgo)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against WILLIE M BUTLER. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22823245)Document filed by WILLIE M BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Eddy, Deborah) Modified on 12/2/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenburgh Health Center Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Glenn Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RNP Barbara Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE M BUTLER
Represented By: Deborah D Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie M. Butler
Represented By: Deborah D Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?