Mazza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lisa Loring Mazza
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv10062
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Referring Judge: Kevin Nathaniel Fox
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Shoshanah Cohen on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Cohen, Judith)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Lisa Loring Mazza. (Attachments: #1 Summons served Commissioner of Social Security c/o U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons served Commissioner of Social Security c/o U.S. Attorney).(Osborn, Daniel)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (sj)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/3/2020) (nb)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/3/2020) (nb)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on April 20, 2016) (sj)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis . Document filed by Lisa Loring Mazza..(Osborn, Daniel)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security with rider, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lisa Loring Mazza..(Osborn, Daniel)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Osborn, Daniel)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Lisa Loring Mazza..(Osborn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Judith Shoshanah Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Loring Mazza
Represented By: Daniel Adam Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?