American Civil Liberties Union v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2020cv10083
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #8 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
January 14, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica F. Rosenbaum on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
December 28, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/27/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan)
December 28, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Customs and Border Protection served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/27/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan)
December 28, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Department of Homeland Security served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/27/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan)
December 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Talia Kraemer on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kraemer, Talia)
December 4, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(dnh)
December 4, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Customs and Border Protection..(dnh)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security..(dnh)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/4/2020) (jca)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #8 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Customs and Border Protection, re: #8 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #8 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wessler, Nathan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, #2 Exhibit B - CBP Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - DHS Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - ICE Correspondence).(Wessler, Nathan)
December 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nathan Freed Wessler to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the similar case number is on the wrong section of the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
December 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Nathan Freed Wessler to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nathan Freed Wessler to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the FOIA summons form must be used. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (jgo).
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Customs and Border Protection, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (jgo).
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (jgo).
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-11311 (JSR). Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Wessler, Nathan)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wessler, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (jgo).
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against American Civil Liberties Union. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22841172)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, #2 Exhibit B - CBP Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - DHS Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - ICE Correspondence).(Wessler, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Nathan Freed Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?