Irving H. Picard v. Sage Realty et al
Plaintiff: Irving H. Picard
Defendant: Sage Realty, Martin A. Sage, Ann M. Sage Passer and Malcolm H. Sage
In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10109
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Referring Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Oral Argument. The conference scheduled for February 19, 2021 is adjourned sine die and the request for oral argument is denied. Defendant may file a five page response to Plaintiff's sur-reply by February 5, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/27/2021) (kv)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Defendants' motion to withdraw the reference addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Andrew B. Kratenstein dated 1/27/2021. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty..(Kratenstein, Andrew)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4400A, 08-1789 (SMB). (Trustee's Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion to Withdraw the Reference). Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Brown, Seanna)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Seanna R. Brown dated December 23, 2020 re: Response to Your Honors Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Brown, Seanna)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Andrew B. Kratenstein dated 12/22/2020 re: Courtesy copies of papers filed in connection with Defendants' Motions to Withdraw the Reference. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty..(Kratenstein, Andrew)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Kratenstein re: #11 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, / Reply Declaration of Andrew B. Kratenstein In Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Withdraw The Reference. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit J).(Kratenstein, Andrew)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4400A, 08-1789 (SMB). . Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty..(Kratenstein, Andrew)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, February 19, 2021 at 3:30 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/16/2020) (nb)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Seanna R. Brown in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4400A, 08-1789 (SMB).. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sage Associates Customer Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sage Associates Claim Determination Objection, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sage Realty Customer Claim, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sage Realty Claim Determination Objection, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sage Associates 1S0004 Account Agreements, #6 Exhibit 6 - Sage Associates 1S0547 Account Agreements, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sage Realty 1S0006 and 1S0316 Account Agreements).(Brown, Seanna)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4400A, 08-1789 (SMB). . Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Brown, Seanna)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seanna R. Brown on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Brown, Seanna)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-10057-AJN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Lewis J. Liman is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Katherine Polk Failla is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Kratenstein in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4400A, 08-1789 (SMB).. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(bkar)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4400A, 08-1789 (SMB).. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty. (bkar)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-10057-AJN. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty..(Kratenstein, Andrew)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ann M. Sage Passer, Malcolm H. Sage, Martin A. Sage, Sage Realty..(Kratenstein, Andrew)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4400A, 08-1789 (SMB).Document filed by Sage Realty, Martin A. Sage, Malcolm H. Sage, Ann M. Sage Passer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bkar)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irving H. Picard v. Sage Realty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sage Realty
Represented By: Carole Neville
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Represented By: Michael Robert Huttenlocher, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Bennett Kratenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin A. Sage
Represented By: Carole Neville
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Represented By: Michael Robert Huttenlocher, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Bennett Kratenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann M. Sage Passer
Represented By: Carole Neville
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Represented By: Michael Robert Huttenlocher, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Bennett Kratenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm H. Sage
Represented By: Carole Neville
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Represented By: Michael Robert Huttenlocher, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Bennett Kratenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving H. Picard
Represented By: Nicholas J. Cremona
Represented By: David J. Sheehan
Represented By: Stacey Ann Bell
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal
Represented By: Seanna R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?